UMB Bank, N.A. v. Soleil Chartered Bank
Original Case: 1:18-cv-09879
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01018 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 17, 2020 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Soleil Capitale Group
|
|
Defendant
Govind Srivastava
|
|
Defendant
Soleil Capitale Corporation
|
|
Defendant-Third-Party - Appellant
Soleil Chartered Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marquette Commercial Finance
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
UMB Bank N.A, DBA UMB Capital Finance
|
Represented By
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Sam Kane Beef Processors, LLC
|
Docket last updated: 07/17/2020 4:28 AM EDT |
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Soleil Chartered Bank, FILED. [2806548] 20-1018 [Entered: 03/20/2020 03:52 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 18 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/19/2020, RECEIVED.[2806567] 20-1018 [Entered: 03/20/2020 04:04 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Soleil Chartered Bank, district court receipt # ANYSDC-19169064, FILED.[2806577] 20-1018 [Entered: 03/20/2020 04:11 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2806583] 20-1018 [Entered: 03/20/2020 04:13 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 18 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Matias Ricardo Gallego-Manzano for Appellee Marquette Commercial Finance, Laith J. Hamdan for Appellee UMB Bank N.A and Cameron A. Lallier for Appellee Marquette Commercial Finance, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2806589] 20-1018 [Entered: 03/20/2020 04:16 PM] |