Apotex Corp. v. Hospira Healthcare India Priva
Original Case: 1:18-cv-04903
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01016 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 27, 2020 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Hospira Healthcare India Private Limited, an Indian Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hospira, Inc., a Delaware corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Apotex Corp., a Delaware Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/27/2020 4:29 AM EDT |
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Apotex Corp., FILED. [2806453] 20-1016 [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:41 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 23 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 22 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 07/12/2019, RECEIVED.[2806457] 20-1016 [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:44 PM] | |
3 | 3 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2806458] 20-1016 [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:46 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Apotex Corp., district court receipt # ANYSDC-19167483, FILED.[2806465] 20-1016 [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:49 PM] | |
5 | 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Ana Cecilia Reyes for Appellee Hospira Healthcare India Private Limited and Hospira, Inc., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2806466] 20-1016 [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:50 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2806471] 20-1016 [Entered: 03/20/2020 02:52 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 21 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |