Toussie v. Allstate Insurance Company
Original Case: 1:14-cv-02705
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01035 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2021 5:33 AM EST |
Defendant
George J Schlott, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Alan Rodriguez Insurance Agency, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Alan Rodriguez
|
|
Defendant
Schlott George
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Allstate Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert Toussie
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/04/2021 4:29 AM EST |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert Toussie, FILED. [2807231] 20-1035 [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:35 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 35 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 11 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/05/2020, RECEIVED.[2807240] 20-1035 [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:39 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/06/2020, RECEIVED.[2807246] 20-1035 [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:40 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Robert Toussie, district court receipt # ANYEDC-12567772, FILED.[2807251] 20-1035 [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:42 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2807272] 20-1035 [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:53 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 35 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |