Nereida Morales v. The New York and Presbyterian
Original Case: 1:18-cv-09711
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01036 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 27, 2020 4:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Tarik Collins, individually
|
|
Defendant
United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
|
|
Defendant
Luckencia Orphee
|
|
Defendant
The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Mayflor Santos
|
|
Defendant
Columbia University Health Care, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Society of Practitioners of the Columbia University Medical Center, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Columbia Presbyterian Medical Center
|
|
Defendant
The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
|
|
Defendant
Columbia University College of Physicians and Surgeons
|
|
Defendant
Miriam Nolasco, individually
|
|
Defendant
Lester Welch, individually
|
|
Defendant
May Flores
|
|
Defendant
Jensi Mercedes, individually
|
|
Defendant
Michael Dzcez, individually
|
|
Defendant
Jamela Daniels, individually
|
|
Defendant
Audrea Blachard, individually
|
|
Defendant
Roberto Hunte, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Farley Obusan, individually
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Walker, individually
|
|
Defendant
Lucrencia Orphee, individually
|
|
Defendant
Thomas Gugliemo, individually
|
|
Defendant
Chastity Cruz, individually
|
|
Defendant
Juan Carlos Garcia, individually
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Columbia University Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York Presbyterian Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chiedozie Anyanwu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nereida Morales
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/27/2020 4:42 AM EDT |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Nereida Morales, FILED. [2807361] 20-1036 [Entered: 03/23/2020 04:47 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 31 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 9 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2807376] 20-1036 [Entered: 03/23/2020 04:52 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2807382] 20-1036 [Entered: 03/23/2020 04:54 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 28 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
4 | 4 1 pgs NOTICE, re: pending district court IFP motion, to district court, SENT.[2807386] 20-1036 [Entered: 03/23/2020 04:56 PM] | |
5 | 5 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2807390] 20-1036 [Entered: 03/23/2020 04:58 PM] |