Tamm Consulting, et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Compa, et al
Original Case: 1:18-cv-11415
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01032 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Jun 03, 2021 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Does
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Companies
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Insurance Companies, Whose Names Are Unknown and Who Made Evaluations, Decisions, and Payment or Non-Payment Decisions , including by not Limited to Claims, Damage, Liability, Subrogation, and/or Reinsurance
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
The Cincinnati Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Turner Forensics
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Turner Engineering, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Daniel D. Turner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
McClure Troy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Einar Tamm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Tamm Consulting
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/03/2021 4:32 AM EDT |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Einar Tamm and Tamm Consulting, FILED. [2807095] 20-1032 [Entered: 03/23/2020 01:35 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 10 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER & OPINION, dated 03/09/2020, RECEIVED.[2807098] 20-1032 [Entered: 03/23/2020 01:38 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/09/2020, RECEIVED.[2807099] 20-1032 [Entered: 03/23/2020 01:39 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2807100] 20-1032 [Entered: 03/23/2020 01:40 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2807101] 20-1032 [Entered: 03/23/2020 01:42 PM] | |
6 | 6 1 pgs NOTICE, to Appellant Tamm Consulting, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2807102] 20-1032 [Entered: 03/23/2020 01:45 PM] |