Genova v. The County of Nassau et al
Original Case: 2:17-cv-04959
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01049 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 25, 2021 7:30 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
County of Nassau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
George Maragos, The Nassau County Comptroller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Anthony J. Genova, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/25/2021 7:29 AM EDT |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Anthony J. Genova, Jr., FILED. [2807926] 20-1049 [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:16 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/21/2020, RECEIVED.[2807933] 20-1049 [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:21 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Anthony J. Genova, Jr., district court receipt # ANYEDC-12568986 , FILED.[2807936] 20-1049 [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:25 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2807937] 20-1049 [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:25 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2807939] 20-1049 [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:27 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |