Parks v. Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, LLC
Original Case: 1:18-cv-06936
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01042 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Jun 04, 2020 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, LLC, DBA Rachael Ray Nutrish
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
J.M. Smucker Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Markeith Parks, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/04/2020 4:27 AM EDT |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Markeith Parks, FILED. [2807684] 20-1042 [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:03 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 5 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 02/20/2020, RECEIVED.[2807687] 20-1042 [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:06 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/21/2020, RECEIVED.[2807688] 20-1042 [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:07 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Markeith Parks, district court receipt # ANYSDC-19180917, FILED.[2807692] 20-1042 [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:09 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2807699] 20-1042 [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:14 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |