Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Patrick M Hunt
Case #: 0:20-cv-60637
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2020
Terminated:Jun 02, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 22, 2020 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
18kjewelry.co
Defendant
aaahandbag.se
Defendant
ada-mr.com
Defendant
as-arc.de
Defendant
bestluxuryreplica.com
Defendant
bestreplicacartier.com
Defendant
bestrollerballpen.top
Defendant
betajewellery.com
Defendant
cartiercopy.com
Defendant
cartierlovering.ca
Defendant
chinanoobwatch02.me
Defendant
clovejs.ru
Defendant
esreplicas.es
Defendant
fine-watches.org
Defendant
firstcopyproductsonline.com
Defendant
gurgarath.fr
Defendant
hooojewellery.net
Defendant
hoooogoods.com
Defendant
idolwatches.world
Defendant
inputmobile.it
Defendant
iwcwatch.in
Defendant
kopi6.com
Defendant
koz.su
Defendant
likeitlike.org
Defendant
luxurywatchcn.com
Defendant
marinamilitarewatch.com
Defendant
montblancpensoutlet.co
Defendant
montblancsuk.com
Defendant
paneraiwatches215.top
Defendant
parfaitmontre.com
Defendant
pensdeutsch.ru
Defendant
puretimewatch.io
Defendant
quartettoitaliano.it
Defendant
relogiohorapremium.com.br
Defendant
replicaswatches.co
Defendant
replicawatchesfactory.me
Defendant
replichemontblanc.com
Defendant
salvamentofregene.it
Defendant
studiotermografico.it
Defendant
watchoices.com
Plaintiff
Cartier International A.G.
Represented By
T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Virgilio Gigante
Stephen M Gaffigan PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Chloe S.A.S.
Represented By
T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Virgilio Gigante
Stephen M Gaffigan PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Montblanc-Simplo GMBH
Represented By
T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Virgilio Gigante
Stephen M Gaffigan PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Officine Panerai A.G.
Represented By
T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Virgilio Gigante
Stephen M Gaffigan PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Richemont International SA
Represented By
T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez
Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.
contact info
Virgilio Gigante
Stephen M Gaffigan PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
22 22 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/01 8:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA re18 Judgment,,,,, Permanent Injunction,,,,17 Order on Motion for Default Judgment upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/01 8:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA re18 Judgment,,,,, Permanent Injunction,,,,17 Order on Motion for Default Judgment upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/01 8:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA re18 Judgment,,,,, Permanent Injunction,,,,17 Order on Motion for Default Judgment upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
19 19 misc Form AO 120/121 Tue 06/02 9:03 PM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (mee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
18 18 order Judgment Permanent Injunction Tue 06/02 9:02 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA against aaahandbag.se, ada-mr.com, as-arc.de, bestluxuryreplica.com, bestreplicacartier.com, bestrollerballpen.top, betajewellery.com, cartiercopy.com, cartierlovering.ca, chinanoobwatch02.me, clovejs.ru, esreplicas.es, fine-watches.org, firstcopyproductsonline.com, gurgarath.fr, hooojewellery.net, hoooogoods.com, idolwatches.world, inputmobile.it, iwcwatch.in, kopi6.com, koz.su, likeitlike.org, luxurywatchcn.com, marinamilitarewatch.com, montblancpensoutlet.co, montblancsuk.com, paneraiwatches215.top, parfaitmontre.com, pensdeutsch.ru, puretimewatch.io, quartettoitaliano.it, relogiohorapremium.com.br, replicaswatches.co, replicawatchesfactory.me, replichemontblanc.com, salvamentofregene.it, studiotermografico.it, watchoices.com, PERMANENT INJUNCTION Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 06/02 8:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT,granting14 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 06/02 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA re 15 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, (Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 30, 2020
15 15 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Sat 05/30 9:15 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER requiring the Plaintiffs, by June 2, 2020, to submit to the Court their proposed default judgment orders in Word format by e-mail in accordance with the Court's13 Order on Default Final Judgment Procedure. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/30/2020. (bsy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
14 14 motion Default Judgment Thu 05/28 4:40 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA.(Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Emma-Jane Tritton in Support Thereof,
Att: 2 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support Thereof,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Default Judgment,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Final Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
13 13 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 05/20 8:35 AM
ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. The Court hereby ORDERS AND ADJUDGES that the Plaintiff must file one of the following two responses by May 29, 2020:(1) Where there is only one Defendant, or where there are multiple Defendants1 but no allegations of joint and several liability and no possibility of inconsistent liability between the Defendants, the Plaintiff shall file a motion for default final judgment. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
12 12 order Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default - FORM Tue 05/12 9:14 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re11 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to 18kjewelry.co, aaahandbag.se, ada-mr.com, as-arc.de, bestluxuryreplica.com, bestreplicacartier.com, bestrollerballpen.top, betajewellery.com, cartiercopy.com, cartierlovering.ca, chinanoobwatch02.me, clovejs.ru, esreplicas.es, fine-watches.org, firstcopyproductsonline.com, gurgarath.fr, hooojewellery.net, hoooogoods.com, idolwatches.world, inputmobile.it, iwcwatch.in, kopi6.com, koz.su, likeitlike.org, luxurywatchcn.com, marinamilitarewatch.com, montblancpensoutlet.co, montblancsuk.com, paneraiwatches215.top, parfaitmontre.com, pensdeutsch.ru, puretimewatch.io, quartettoitaliano.it, relogiohorapremium.com.br, replicaswatches.co, replicawatchesfactory.me, replichemontblanc.com, salvamentofregene.it, studiotermografico.it, watchoices.com. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 5/12/2020. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
11 11 motion Clerks Entry of Default Mon 05/11 3:42 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 18kjewelry.co, aaahandbag.se, ada-mr.com, as-arc.de, bestluxuryreplica.com, bestreplicacartier.com, bestrollerballpen.top, betajewellery.com, cartiercopy.com, cartierlovering.ca, chinanoobwatch02.me, clovejs.ru, esreplicas.es, fine-watches.org, firstcopyproductsonline.com, gurgarath.fr, hooojewellery.net, hoooogoods.com, idolwatches.world, inputmobile.it, iwcwatch.in, kopi6.com, koz.su, likeitlike.org, luxurywatchcn.com, marinamilitarewatch.com, montblancpensoutlet.co, montblancsuk.com, paneraiwatches215.top, parfaitmontre.com, pensdeutsch.ru, puretimewatch.io, quartettoitaliano.it, relogiohorapremium.com.br, replicaswatches.co, replicawatchesfactory.me, replichemontblanc.com, salvamentofregene.it, studiotermografico.it, watchoices.com by Cartier International A.G., Richemont International SA, Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G..(Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 05/11 3:14 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Cartier International A.G., Richemont International SA, Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G.. 18kjewelry.co served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; aaahandbag.se served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; ada-mr.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; as-arc.de served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; bestluxuryreplica.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; bestreplicacartier.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; bestrollerballpen.top served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; betajewellery.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; cartiercopy.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; cartierlovering.ca served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; chinanoobwatch02.me served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; clovejs.ru served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; esreplicas.es served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; fine-watches.org served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; firstcopyproductsonline.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; gurgarath.fr served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; hooojewellery.net served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; hoooogoods.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; idolwatches.world served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; inputmobile.it served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; iwcwatch.in served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; kopi6.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; koz.su served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; likeitlike.org served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; luxurywatchcn.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; marinamilitarewatch.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; montblancpensoutlet.co served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; montblancsuk.com served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020; paneraiwatches215.top served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; parfaitmontre.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; pensdeutsch.ru served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; puretimewatch.io served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; quartettoitaliano.it served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; relogiohorapremium.com.br served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; replicaswatches.co served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; replicawatchesfactory.me served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; replichemontblanc.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; salvamentofregene.it served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; studiotermografico.it served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; watchoices.com served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020.(Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service
Friday, April 03, 2020
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 04/03 4:42 PM
Summons Issued as to 18kjewelry.co, aaahandbag.se, ada-mr.com, as-arc.de, bestluxuryreplica.com, bestreplicacartier.com, bestrollerballpen.top, betajewellery.com, cartiercopy.com, cartierlovering.ca, chinanoobwatch02.me, clovejs.ru, esreplicas.es, fine-watches.org, firstcopyproductsonline.com, gurgarath.fr, hooojewellery.net, hoooogoods.com, idolwatches.world, inputmobile.it, iwcwatch.in, kopi6.com, koz.su, likeitlike.org, luxurywatchcn.com, marinamilitarewatch.com, montblancpensoutlet.co, montblancsuk.com, paneraiwatches215.top, parfaitmontre.com, pensdeutsch.ru, puretimewatch.io, quartettoitaliano.it, relogiohorapremium.com.br, replicaswatches.co, replicawatchesfactory.me, replichemontblanc.com, salvamentofregene.it, studiotermografico.it, watchoices.com. (scn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
8 8 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 04/02 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS OR DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Wed 04/01 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA re6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
6 6 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/01 3:06 PM
ORDER, granting5 Motion Plaintiff's MOTION For Order Authorizing Alternate Service Of Process On Defendants Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) And Memorandum Of Law In Support Thereof by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/27 11:51 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION For Order Authorizing Alternate Service Of Process On Defendants Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) And Memorandum Of Law In Support Thereof by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA.(Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support Thereof,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/27 11:45 AM
Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie Financiere Richemont SA for Cartier International A.G., Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G., Richemont International SA (Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
3 3 misc Form AO 120/121 Thu 03/26 10:15 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 03/26 10:11 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/26 10:01 AM
COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12656489, filed by Cartier International A.G., Richemont International SA, Chloe S.A.S., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Officine Panerai A.G..(Gaffigan, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the IWC Trademarks,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Certificate of Registration for the CARTIER Trademarks,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to the Complaint - Certificate of Registration for the CHLOE Trademarks,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to the Complaint - Certificate of Registration for the MONTBLANC Trademarks,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to the Complaint - Certificate of Registration for the PANERAI Trademarks,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to the Complaint - Website Captures (Part 1),
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 to the Complaint - Website Captures (Part 2)