Tyll v. Stanley Black And Decker Life
Original Case: 3:17-cv-01591
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01060 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 05, 2021 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Stanley Black And Decker Life Insurance Program
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Aetna Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lori T. Tyll, individually and as Independent Executrix of The Estate of Michael A. Tyll
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2021 4:29 AM EDT |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lori T. Tyll, FILED. [2808503] 20-1060 [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:29 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 13 pgs DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 09/11/2018, RECEIVED.[2808509] 20-1060 [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:32 PM] | |
3 | 3 12 pgs DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 11/08/2018, RECEIVED.[2808510] 20-1060 [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:33 PM] | |
4 | 4 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 02/21/2020, RECEIVED.[2808511] 20-1060 [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:33 PM] | |
5 | 5 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/24/2020, RECEIVED.[2808515] 20-1060 [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:34 PM] | |
6 | 6 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Lori T. Tyll, district court receipt # ACTDC-5762686, FILED.[2808517] 20-1060 [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:36 PM] | |
7 | 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2808518] 20-1060 [Entered: 03/25/2020 12:37 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |