Basciano v. Child Support Enforcement
Original Case: 1:19-cv-11797
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01073 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 05, 2020 3:28 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Child Support Enforcement, Mt. Vernon Office
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ronald Basciano
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/05/2020 3:26 AM EST |
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Basciano, FILED. [2808880] 20-1073 [Entered: 03/25/2020 06:25 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/04/2020, RECEIVED.[2808881] 20-1073 [Entered: 03/25/2020 06:27 PM] | |
3 | 3 4 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/23/2020, RECEIVED.[2808882] 20-1073 [Entered: 03/25/2020 06:28 PM] | |
4 | 4 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Basciano, FILED. Service date 02/18/2020 by US mail.[2808883] 20-1073 [Entered: 03/25/2020 06:31 PM] | |
5 | 5 2 pgs DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [4], on behalf of Appellant Ronald Basciano, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2808884] 20-1073 [Entered: 03/25/2020 06:36 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2808885] 20-1073 [Entered: 03/25/2020 06:48 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
7 | 7 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2808886] 20-1073 [Entered: 03/25/2020 06:49 PM] |