The Degas Sculture Project Ltd v. Long
Original Case: 1:14-cv-04304
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01067 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 17, 2020 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Walter F. Maibaum
|
|
Defendant
Carol Conn
|
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Rose Ramey Long, individually, DBA Rose Long Fine Art, AKA RRL Fine Art, AKA Rose Ramey Littlejohn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
The Degas Sculture Project Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Modernism Fine Arts Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/17/2020 4:24 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Modernism Fine Arts Inc and The Degas Sculture Project Ltd, FILED. [2808742] 20-1067 [Entered: 03/25/2020 03:50 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 21 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/05/2020, RECEIVED.[2808755] 20-1067 [Entered: 03/25/2020 03:54 PM] | |
3 | 3 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Eric Allan Buikema, Esq. for Appellant The Degas Sculture Project Ltd and Modernism Fine Arts Inc and Philip Canning Patterson, Esq. for Appellee Rose Ramey Long, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2808760] 20-1067 [Entered: 03/25/2020 03:55 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2808784] 20-1067 [Entered: 03/25/2020 04:18 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 22 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |