Prudential Insurance Company of America, The v. Aynes et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond P Moore |
Referred: | Kathleen M Tafoya |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01133 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1335 Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2014 |
Re-opened: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 14, 2014 5:02 PM MST |
Defendant
Anthony E Aynes
|
|
Defendant
Christopher C Aynes
El Paso County Criminal Justice Center 2739 East Las Vegas Street
Colorado Springs, CO 80906 |
|
Defendant
Timothy N Aynes
|
|
Interested Party
Case Manager for Christopher Aynes
El Paso County Criminal Justice Center 2739 East Las Vegas Street
Colorado Springs, CO 80906 |
|
Plaintiff
Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
85 | 85
order
Judgment
Fri 09/29 8:52 AM
AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to84 Amended Order. Entered by the Clerk of the Court on 9/29/2017. (Document not sent to Case Manager for Christopher Aynes as mail has been returned as undeliverable to that address). (cpear) Modified on 9/29/2017 to add text (cpear) |
|
84 | 84
6
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/29 8:34 AM
AMENDED ORDER: Docket entry82 Order is amended to include that any accrued interest shall be distributed. The83 Final Judgment is VACATED and an Amended Final Judgment shall enter. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/29/2017. (Document not sent to Case Manager for Christopher Aynes as mail has been returned as undeliverable to that address). (cpear) Modified on 9/29/2017 (cpear) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
83 | 83
order
Judgment
Thu 09/28 2:20 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to82 Order. Entered by the Clerk of the Court on 9/28/2017. (cpear) |
|
82 | 82
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 09/28 12:48 PM
ORDER granting74 Motion for Summary Judgment, modifying and adopting77 Report and Recommendations, overruling in part and sustaining in part81 Plaintiff's objection to Report and Recommendation. Judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/28/2017. (cpear) |