Angela Ma v. Kendall Jenner, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Mark C Scarsi |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-03011 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 31, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 27, 2020 1:42 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kendall Jenner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kendall Jenner, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Ma
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Thu 10/15 10:58 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Mailed closing report to Copyright Office (lc) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 10/15 10:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT20 AND WITH 45 DAYS TO REOPEN IF SETTLEMENT NOT COMPLETED. All hearings and deadlines VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 10/14 4:13 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Case number is incorrect or missing. Title page is missing. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice Other. Other error(s) with document(s): pdf is A Notice of Ruling from USDC Southern CA. MISSING LR-11-3/8 required filer, attorney, court and case information of the Central District of CA. The attachment of ruling was efiled with prior active electronic headers from the other court, thus making current header illegible. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Wed 10/14 12:44 PM
Miscellaneous Order filed by Plaintiff Angela Ma (Goonan, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Settlement
Wed 10/07 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants Kendall Jenner, Kendall Jenner, Inc.. (Soltman, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Thu 10/01 12:48 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-145) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Mark C. Scarsi, this case is transferred from Judge George H. Wu to the calendar of Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-03011 MCS(MRWx). (rn) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 07/27 12:30 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicholas Cooper Soltman counsel for Defendants Kendall Jenner, Kendall Jenner, Inc.. Adding Nicolas C. Soltman as counsel of record for Defendants Kendall Jenner, Inc. and Kendall Jenner for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants Kendall Jenner, Inc. and Kendall Jenner. (Attorney Nicholas Cooper Soltman added to party Kendall Jenner(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Cooper Soltman added to party Kendall Jenner, Inc.(pty:dft))(Soltman, Nicholas) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 07/27 12:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan P Steinsapir counsel for Defendants Kendall Jenner, Kendall Jenner, Inc.. Adding Jonathan P. Steinsapir as counsel of record for Defendants Kendall Jenner, Inc. and Kendall Jenner for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants Kendall Jenner, Inc. and Kendall Jenner. (Attorney Jonathan P Steinsapir added to party Kendall Jenner(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan P Steinsapir added to party Kendall Jenner, Inc.(pty:dft))(Steinsapir, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/21 3:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) and finds it can set the schedule in this matter without hearing further statements from the parties. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the July 23, 2020, scheduling conference/Rule 26(f) conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: (Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2020. Discovery cut-off 11/19/2020. Motions due by 1/18/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report
Wed 07/08 6:01 PM
JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Angela Ma. (Goonan, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, June 11, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/11 4:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for July 23, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than July 9, 2020. See Local Rule 26-1. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 06/08 1:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Kendall Jenner, Kendall Jenner, Inc., (Kump, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/08 12:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Kendall Jenner, Kendall Jenner, Inc..(Attorney Michael J Kump added to party Kendall Jenner(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Kump added to party Kendall Jenner, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kump, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/13 11:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Angela Ma. upon Kendall Jenner waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/7/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; Kendall Jenner, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/7/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Michael J. Kump, Attorney for Defendants. (Goonan, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
10
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/09 11:42 AM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/02 3:17 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Kendall Jenner and Kendall Jenner, Inc. (jtil) |
|
Att: 1 KJ, Inc. | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 04/02 2:54 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 04/02 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/31 11:34 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Angela Ma. (Goonan, Gregory) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/31 11:33 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Angela Ma. (Goonan, Gregory) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/31 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angela Ma, identifying None. (Goonan, Gregory) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Tue 03/31 11:30 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Angela Ma. (Goonan, Gregory) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/31 11:30 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angela Ma. (Goonan, Gregory) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/31 11:27 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25917329 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Angela Ma. (Attorney Gregory P Goonan added to party Angela Ma (pty:pla))(Goonan, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |