Pimentel-Estrada v. Asher
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Referred: | Brian A Tsuchida |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00495 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2020 3:43 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Rafael Pimentel-Estrada
023655798 NW DETENTION CENTER - TACOMA 1623 E. J STREET, SUITE 5
TACOMA, WA 98421 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Matthew T Albence
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Nathalie Asher
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Steven Langford
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Respondent
William P Barr
Terminated: 04/14/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |