STEELE et al v. LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy R Rice |
Case #: | 5:20-cv-01754 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 29, 2020 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION LLC
4136 BETHMAN ROAD
EASTON, PA 18045 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC
4136 BETHMAN ROAD
EASTON, PA 18045 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ANDREW MIKLOS
4136 BETHMAN ROAD
EASTON, PA 18045 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHRISTINA MIKLOS
4136 BETHMAN ROAD
EASTON, PA 18045 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARMANDO RAMOS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CODY STEELE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Mon 04/05 9:11 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED. THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS INCORPORATED TO THIS ORDER AND IS APPROVED AS A FAIR, ADEQUATE AND REASONABLE RESOLUTION OF A BONE-FIDE DISPUTE. SERVICE AWARDS ARE FINALLY APPROVED IN THE AMOUNT OF THREE THOUSAND FIVE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($3,500.00) EACH TO PLAINTIFFS CODY STEELE AND ARMANDO RAMOS ($7,000.00 IN TOTAL). SETTLEMENT CLASS COUNSEL'S ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS ARE FINALLY APPROVED IN THE AMOUNT OF $50,000.00); ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/5/21.4/5/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) |
|
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Settlement
Thu 04/01 5:35 PM
First MOTION for Settlement Approval of Collective Action Settlement filed by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE.Memorandum, Brief, Declaration, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Uncontested Motion, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration A - Decl. of J. Goodley, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B - Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C - JS fees and costs, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D - GL fees and costs, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 1 - settlement allocation, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 2 - settlement notice | ||
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
order
Consent and Order to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/25 2:30 PM
CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THAT THIS CAS IS REFERRED TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE TIMOTHY R. RICE TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 636(c) AND FED.R.CIV.P.73. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/25/21. 1/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 01/22 12:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE Settlement Conference VIA TELECONFERENCE held on 1/22/21. (JL ) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 01/14 8:40 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO JANUARY 22, 2021 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE VIA TELECONFERENCE.(dc) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Wed 12/02 3:50 PM
ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY JUNE 30, 2021; DEFENDANTS SHALL BE PERMITTED TO DEPOSE THE TWO (2) NAMED PLAINTIFFS, AS WELL AS SIX (6) OTHER OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS. FOUR (4) OF THOSE OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS TO BE DEPOSED SHALL BE SELECTED BY DEFENDANTS, AND THE REMAINING TWO (2) SHALL BE CHOSEN AT RANDOM; PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A MOTION FOR DECERTIFICATION WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS OF THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY; THE PARTIES WILL FILE ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN NINETY (90) DAYS AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY. ALL OPPOSITIONS TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED WITHIN TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS, AND ALL REPLIES SHALL BE FILED WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS; AND A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON MARCH 5, 2021, AT 10:00 AM. PLAINTIFFS SHALL PROVIDE A CONFERENCE NUMBER THAT THE PARTIES AND THE COURT CAN CALL INTO AT THE TIME OF THE CALL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 12/2/20. 12/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 12/01 2:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 12/1/20. Court Reporter: None. (er, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Pretrial Conference - Interim
Tue 11/17 3:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE Settlement Conference/Pretrial Conference held on 11/17/20. (rf, ) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing
Tue 11/17 3:52 PM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 23, 2020 AT 9:30 BEFORE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE IS CANCELLED.(dc) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/25 3:22 PM
NOTICE by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE Notice of Consent of Jos Mateo to Join Collective Action Lawsuit(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service COS | ||
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 09/24 3:57 PM
ORDER THAT THE TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 22, 2020 IS RESCHEDULED TO TUESDAY, DECEMBER 1, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE A TELECONFERENCE DIAL IN NUMBER AND CODE FOR ALL PARTIES AND EMAIL SAME TO CHAMBERS EMAIL (CHAMBERS_JUDGE_JEFFREY_L_SCHMEHL@PAED.USCOURTS.GOV.) COUNSEL SHALL FOLLOW JUDGE SCHMEHLS POLICIES AND PROCEDURES WHICH CAN BE FOUND AT WWW.PAED.USCOURTS.GOV.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/24/20. 9/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 09/24 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO NOVEMBER 23, 2020 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE VIA TELECONFERENCE.(dc) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/21 2:41 PM
NOTICE by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE Notice of Consent of Ever Membreno to Join Collective Action Lawsuit(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service COS | ||
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/18 10:35 AM
NOTICE by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE Notice of Consent of Adelman Sanchez to Join Collective Action Lawsuit(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service COS | ||
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/11 4:38 PM
NOTICE by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE of Consent of David Hernandez, Jose Hernandez, Gerson Membreno, Franklin Membreno, Joel Membreno & Geovanni Palacios to Join Collective Action Lawsuit(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service COS | ||
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/27 4:33 PM
NOTICE by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE Notice of Consent of Justin Briggs, Josue Centeno, Luis Cruz, Luis Galvez, Roger Gonzalez, Jose Membreno, Jose Morales, Roberto Moreno, Otoniel Vasquez and William Vazquez to Join Collective Action Lawsuit(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 opt in, | ||
Att: 2 opt in, | ||
Att: 3 opt in, | ||
Att: 4 opt in, | ||
Att: 5 opt in, | ||
Att: 6 opt in, | ||
Att: 7 opt in, | ||
Att: 8 opt in, | ||
Att: 9 opt in, | ||
Att: 10 cos | ||
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 07/15 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCTOBER 13, 2020 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE VIA TELECONFERENCE.(dc) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement
Mon 07/13 9:56 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/10/20. 7/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) |
|
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/13 9:48 AM
ORDER THAT THE ORAL ARGUMENT AND RULE 16 CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR JULY 22, 2020, ARE CANCELLED; AND THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL NOW BE HELD VIA TELEPHONE ON OCTOBER 22, 2020, AT 2:00 P.M. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE NUMBER FOR THE COURT AND ALL PARTIES TO DIAL INTO AT THE TIME OF THE CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/10/20. 7/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) |
|
21 | 21
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/10 4:38 PM
ORDER THAT ALL FORMAL DISCOVERY IS STAYED PENDING COMPLETION OF THE OPT-IN PROCESS DESCRIBED HEREIN. THE PARTIES AGREE THAT THE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION (ECF NO.3 ) SHALL BE DEEMED WITHDRAWN AS MOOT; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/10/20.7/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) Modified on 7/10/2020 (mas, ) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/10 12:57 PM
NOTICE by CODY STEELE of inclusion of the following class member: KADE KRESSMAN(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service COS | ||
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 07/06 11:14 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS, LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC, JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION, LLC, ANDREW MIKLOS, AND CHRISTINA MIKLOS TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION (ECF N. 3) FILED BY PLAINTIFFS SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL JULY 10, 2020, SO AS TO PROVIDE THE PARTIES WITH ADDITIONAL TIME TO ATTEMPT TO NEGOTIATE A STIPULATED ORDER FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/6/20. 7/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (er, ) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/06 11:22 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Conditional Certification . RESPONSES DUE BY 7/10/2020. (er, ) |
||
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/26 10:01 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION LLC, LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC, ANDREW MIKLOS, CHRISTINA MIKLOS.(LANDESMAN, JONATHAN) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/22 5:02 PM
ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION (DOCKET NO.3 ) SHALL BE HELD ON JULY 22, 2020, AT 10:00 A.M. VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE; A RULE 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE ORAL ARGUMENT; THE PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R.CIV. P. 26(A) WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; 4. THE PARTIES SHALL COMMENCE DISCOVERY IMMEDIATELY; 5. AFTER CONSULTATION WITH COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES, COUNSEL SHALL COMPLETE AND SUBMIT THE REQUIRED JOINT STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO RULE 26 (F); 6. COUNSEL SHALL FOLLOW JUDGE SCHMEHL'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES WHICH CAN BE FOUND AT WWW.PAED.USCOURTS.GOV.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/22/20. 6/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) |
|
16 | 16
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 06/22 12:38 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND THROUGH THEIR REPRESENTATIVE COUNSEL, THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS, LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC, JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION, LLC, ANDREW MIKLOS, AND CHRISTINA MIKLOS, TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL JUNE 26, 2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/16/20. 6/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Tue 06/16 9:35 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION LLC.(LANDESMAN, JONATHAN) |
|
14 | 14
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Tue 06/16 9:33 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC.(LANDESMAN, JONATHAN) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/16 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARC B. CYTRYN on behalf of JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION LLC, LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC, ANDREW MIKLOS, CHRISTINA MIKLOS with Certificate of Service(CYTRYN, MARC) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/16 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN LANDESMAN on behalf of JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION LLC, LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC, ANDREW MIKLOS, CHRISTINA MIKLOS with Certificate of Service(LANDESMAN, JONATHAN) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 04/28 1:06 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE APPLICABLE STATUTES OF LIMITATION UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT, 29 U.S.C. § 201, ET SEQ. ("FLSA") AND THE PENNSYLVANIA MINIMUM WAGE ACT, 43 P.S. § 333.101 ET SEQ. ("PMW A") SHALL BE TOLLED FOR ALL POTENTIAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS FROM APRIL 2, 2020 (THE DATE THIS ACTION WAS FILED) THROUGH THE CONCLUSION OF THIS ACTION. THAT THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION, ECF NO.3 , BE SET FOR JULY 3, 2020, 14 DAYS AFTER THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SEE WAIVERS OF SERVICE, ECF NOS.4 -7 . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/28/20. 4/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Tue 04/28 9:52 AM
Proposed Pretrial Order re: Tolling the Statute of Limitations and Responding to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE.(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/28 9:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CODY STEELE, ARMANDO RAMOS. LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/28 9:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CODY STEELE, ARMANDO RAMOS. JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION LLC waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/28 9:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CODY STEELE, ARMANDO RAMOS. CHRISTINA MIKLOS waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/28 9:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CODY STEELE, ARMANDO RAMOS. ANDREW MIKLOS waiver sent on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/28 1:09 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to3 MOTION for Conditional Certification . RESPONSES DUE BY 7/3/2020. (mas, ) |
||
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/23 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARC L. GELMAN on behalf of ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE(GELMAN, MARC) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/22 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN P. MCCARTHY on behalf of ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE with Certificate of Service(MCCARTHY, RYAN) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/20 2:53 PM
MOTION for Conditional Certification filed by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 | ||
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/09 3:29 PM
Summons Issued as to JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION LLC, LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC, ANDREW MIKLOS, CHRISTINA MIKLOS. Forwarded To: Emailed Counsel on 4/9/2020 (kp, ) |
||
Thursday, April 02, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Thu 04/02 3:56 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE.(GOODLEY, JAMES) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 04/02 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT against JACK GRACE CONSTRUCTION LLC, LEHIGH VALLEY UNDERGROUND, LLC, ANDREW MIKLOS, CHRISTINA MIKLOS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14214747.), filed by CODY STEELE, ARMANDO RAMOS.(GOODLEY, JAMES) *ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT* Modified on 4/2/2020 (lisad, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Disclosure Statement Form, | ||
Att: 4 Case Management Track Designation Form, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 04/02 3:08 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ARMANDO RAMOS, CODY STEELE. (lisad, ) |