Member Case
Lead case is: 3:20-bk-01243

Mississippi Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Neil P Olack
Case #: 3:20-bk-01245
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2020
Terminated:Jul 28, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Amazing Energy Holdings, LLC
5700 W Plano Pkwy Ste 3600
Plano, TX 75093-2455
Represented By
David Wheeler
Wheeler & Wheeler, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
501 East Court Street Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, July 30, 2020
189 189 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Order Closing Case Thu 07/30 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Order Closing Case Related [+] Notice Date 07/30/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 188 Order Closing Case
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
188 188 order Closing Case (ALL CHAPTERS) Tue 07/28 4:54 PM
Order Closing Case. (Sanderson, Dawn)
Related: [-]