U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronald L Buckwalter |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-02333 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 16, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 3:02 AM EST |
Defendant
815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TOP26-815 N. POTTSTOWN PIKE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Receiver
HOSPITALITY RECEIVER, LLC
14800 Landmark blvd suite 800
DALLAS, TX 75254 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Terminated: 12/11/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 10/16 1:53 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS CLOSED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 2/2/2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 10/16/2015. 10/16/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, ) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
44 | 44
service
Writ Returned
Mon 05/04 4:41 PM
WRIT of EXECUTION Returned UNEXECUTED as to 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AS TO 4/24/15. (jaa, ) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2015 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Status Report
Mon 03/02 5:13 PM
STATUS REPORT of Receiver - Final Report by TOP26-815 N. POTTSTOWN PIKE LLC. (O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) |
|
Monday, February 02, 2015 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order
Mon 02/02 4:37 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE FORECLOSURE SALE CONDUCTED ON 1/8/2015 IS CONFIRMED IN ALL RESPECTS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. UPON THE FILING OF THE FINAL REPORT, THE RECEIVERSHIP SHALL TERMINATE AND THE RECEIVER SHALL BE DISCHARGED FROM ANY AND ALL FURTHER OBLIGATION UNDER THE RECEIVERSHIP ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 2/2/2015. 2/2/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(kp, ) |
|
Friday, January 23, 2015 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
Fri 01/23 4:33 PM
STIPULATION re39 MOTION for Confirmation OF FORECLOSURE SALE AND TO TERMINATE RECEIVERSHIP by TOP26-815 N. POTTSTOWN PIKE LLC.**(COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) Modified on 1/26/2015 (tjd). |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 22, 2015 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)
Thu 01/22 4:24 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by TOP26-815 N. POTTSTOWN PIKE LLC. Amendment to39 MOTION for Confirmation OF FORECLOSURE SALE AND TO TERMINATE RECEIVERSHIP (Amended Proposed Order) . (O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) |
|
Friday, January 16, 2015 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Confirmation
Fri 01/16 3:14 PM
MOTION for Confirmation OF FORECLOSURE SALE AND TO TERMINATE RECEIVERSHIP filed by TOP26-815 N. POTTSTOWN PIKE LLC.Affidavit and Certificate of Service.(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mortgaged Premises, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Receivership Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service by Jeffrey Nugent, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Notice of Sale, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F -Proofs of Publication, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Receiver, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Chester County Tax Claim Bureau, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Mechanic's Lien, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Carter Mechanical, Inc., | ||
Att: 11 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 12 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, December 11, 2014 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 12/11 12:11 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TOP26-815 N. POTTSTOWN PIKE LLC IS HEREBY SUBSTITUTED AS PLAINTIFF IN THE ACTION AND THE CAPTION IS AMENDED TO REFLECT TOP26-815 N. POTTSTOWN PIKE LLC AS THE PLAINTIFF.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 12/11/2014. 12/11/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 09, 2014 | ||
37 | 37
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 12/09 10:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jeffrey Nugent re: served Writ of Execution and Notice of Sale upon 815 Limited Partnership by Personal Service on 12/4/14 (O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) |
|
Friday, December 05, 2014 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
Fri 12/05 10:29 AM
STIPULATION to Substitute Party and Amend Caption and Pleadings by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.**(FILED IN ERROR, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) Modified on 12/10/2014 (tjd). |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 04, 2014 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Substitute Party
Thu 12/04 4:48 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party and Amend Caption and Pleadings filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.Certificate of Service.(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Writ Issued
Thu 12/04 10:33 AM
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED AS TO DEFENDANT 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP IN THE AMOUNT OF $13,893,599.15. HANDED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ON 12/4/2014. (kp, ) |
||
Wednesday, November 26, 2014 | ||
(FILED IN ERROR) WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED AS TO DEFENDANT 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP IN THE AMOUNT OF $13,893,599.15. (kp, ) Modified on 12/4/2014 (kp, ). | ||
Monday, November 24, 2014 | ||
34 | 34 Praecipe for Writ of Execution by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) | |
Att: 1 Notice of Writ of Execution, | ||
Att: 2 Writ of Execution | ||
Wednesday, November 19, 2014 | ||
33 | 33 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 11/19/2014.11/20/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
32 | 32 CONSENT ORDER FOR JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 11/19/2014. 11/20/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
31 | 31 STIPULATION TO CONSENT JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.**(FILED IN ERROR, COPY FORWARDED TO CHAMBERS FOR APPROVAL)**(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) Modified on 11/20/2014 (tjd). | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 13, 2014 | ||
30 | 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 11/15/2014.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 11/13/2014. 11/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
29 | 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 11/10/2014.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 10/28/2014. 10/29/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
Thursday, October 16, 2014 | ||
28 | 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.Brief, Certificate of Service.(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) | |
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, part 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, part 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 13 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 07, 2014 | ||
27 | 27 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 10/7/2014.10/7/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
Monday, September 29, 2014 | ||
BOND OF RECEIVER WITH SURETY in the amount of $ $25,000.00 with TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA as surety posted by HOSPITALITY RECEIVER, LLC (kp, ) | ||
Thursday, September 25, 2014 | ||
26 | 26 ORDER APPOINTING HOSPITALITY RECEIVER, LLC AS RECEIVER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 9/24/2014. 9/25/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO RECEIVER, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/25/2014) (kp, ). | |
25 | 25 2 pgs MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 9/24/2014. 9/25/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
Friday, August 15, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) | |
Friday, August 08, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.(CIARDI, ALBERT) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
22 | 22 RESPONSE in Support re17 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, August 04, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP re20 Response in Opposition to Motion, (CIARDI, ALBERT) | |
Friday, August 01, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.(CIARDI, ALBERT) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Objection to Renewed Motion to Appoint Receiver, | ||
Att: 2 Verification, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Part 1, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C - Part 2, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C - Part 3, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, July 24, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.Brief, Certificate of Service.(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) | |
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, part 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, part 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 12 Text of Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ROSS G. CURRIE on behalf of U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (CURRIE, ROSS) | |
Friday, July 18, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.Brief, Certificate of Service.(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) | |
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, part 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, part 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A, part 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit H, part 1, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit H, part 2, | ||
Att: 14 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 26, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER THAT THE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER IS HEREBY DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 6/24/2014. 6/26/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
15 | 15 3 pgs MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 6/25/2014. 6/26/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
Wednesday, June 18, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 815 Limited Partnership's Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Its re 4 Petition for Appointment of Receiver filed by 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, certificate of service.(CIARDI, ALBERT) Modified on 6/19/2014 (fb). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 16, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 8/22/2014. THE TRIAL POOL IS SET FOR 9/22/2014. FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS AND DEADLINES ARE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 6/16/2014. 6/16/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
Friday, June 06, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 REPLY in Support re4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) Modified on 6/9/2014 (lisad, ). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of M. Nikula, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Indemnity Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 02, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP re10 Objections, (SIEDMAN, DANIEL) | |
Friday, May 30, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Objections by 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP re4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver ,9 Order, Objection of 815 Limited Partnership to Plaintiff's Petition for Appointment of Receiver .(SIEDMAN, DANIEL) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D | ||
Thursday, May 29, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER IS EXTENDED UNTIL 5/30/2014.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/28/2014. 5/29/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) | |
Friday, May 23, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition for Appointment of a Receiver by 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. (SIEDMAN, DANIEL) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/27/2014 (nd, ). | |
Thursday, May 15, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.(SIEDMAN, DANIEL) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, May 12, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ALBERT ANTHONY CIARDI, III on behalf of 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP with Certificate of Service(CIARDI, ALBERT) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL SEAN SIEDMAN on behalf of 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP with Certificate of Service(SIEDMAN, DANIEL) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 06, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 PETITION for Appointment of Receiver filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(O'HALLORAN, RICHARD) Modified on 5/7/2014 (lisad, ). | |
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Mortgaged Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Mortgage Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Lease Assignment, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, May 01, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION re: Jeffrey Nugent served Summons and Complaint upon 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP by Personal Service. 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP served on 4/25/2014, answer due 5/16/2014. (RICKER, ALYSON) | |
Tuesday, April 22, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(tj, ) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 099923.), filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TRUSTEE, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(tj, ) (tj, ). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form | ||
Att: 4 (4/23/2014) Ex A, | ||
Att: 5 (4/23/2014) Ex B-1, | ||
Att: 6 (4/23/2014) Ex B-2, | ||
Att: 7 (4/23/2014) Ex C, | ||
Att: 8 (4/23/2014) Ex D, | ||
Att: 9 (4/23/2014) Ex E, | ||
Att: 10 (4/23/2014) Ex F | ||
Summons Issued as to 815 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/23/14 (tj, ) |