3M Company v. Rx2Live, LLC
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Referred: | Stanley A Boone |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00523 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2020 3:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rx2Live, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RX2Live, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 03, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/03 10:09 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/2/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A) |
|
Friday, July 30, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 07/30 9:59 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Consent Judgment and Permanent Injunction by 3M Company.(Zarlenga, Carmine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 01, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Statement
Thu 07/01 6:05 AM
STATEMENT of of Report Per Stipulation and Order filed by Defendants RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC. (Eisenberg, Lloyd) |
|
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Statement
Mon 04/05 8:19 AM
STATEMENT of Report Per Stipulation and Order filed by Defendants RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC. (Eisenberg, Lloyd) |
|
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
order
Minute Order
Fri 04/02 4:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) Pursuant to the stipulated preliminary injunction order entered May 8, 202023 , on the first day of each quarter, continuing throughout the pendency of this action, defendants are required to file a written report detailing the steps taken to comply with the May 8, 2020 order. For the third time, defendants have failed to timely comply with this requirement. If the court is required to remind defendants of this obligation again, this minute order will serve as notice that the court will likely impose sanctions on counsel signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on April 2, 2021. (Munoz, I) |
|
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/01 3:07 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the September 22, 2020 scheduling order is amended as follows: Deadline to disclose expert witnesses: July 1, 2021 Non-expert discovery cut-off: July 29, 2021 Deadline to disclose supplemental experts: August 12, 2021 Expert discovery cut-off: September 27, 2021 Deadline to file dispositive motions: October 28, 2021; Pretrial conference: March 10, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4 (DAD); and All other aspects of the September 22, 2020 scheduling order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/1/2021: (Hernandez, M) |
|
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 03/31 6:05 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by 3M Company.(Zarlenga, Carmine) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jillian Joseph | ||
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Statement
Fri 01/08 9:36 AM
STATEMENT of of Report Per Stipulation and Order filed by Defendants RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC filed by Defendants RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC re23 Stipulation and Order. (Eisenberg, Lloyd) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
order
Minute Order
Wed 01/06 8:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) Defendants are again reminded that pursuant to the stipulated preliminary injunction order entered May 8, 202023 , on the first day of each quarter, continuing throughout the pendency of this action, defendants are required to file a written report detailing the steps taken to comply with the May 8, 2020 order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on January 6, 2021. (Munoz, I) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Statement
Mon 10/05 10:59 AM
STATEMENT of Report Per Stipulation and Order filed by Defendants RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC re23 Stipulation and Order. (Eisenberg, Lloyd) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
order
Minute Order
Fri 10/02 10:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY): Defendants are reminded that pursuant to the stipulated preliminary injunction order entered May 8, 202023 , on the first day of each quarter, continuing throughout the pendency of this action, defendants are required to file a written report detailing the steps taken to comply with the May 8, 2020 order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on October 2, 2020. (Munoz, I) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/22 9:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER :Discovery Deadlines:Initial Disclosures: August 4, 2020; Non-Expert Discovery: April 30, 2021; Expert Disclosure: April 2, 2021; Supplemental Expert Disclosure: May 14, 2021; Expert Discovery: June 29, 2021; Dispositive Motion Deadlines:Filing: July 30, 2021; Hearing: Pursuant to Local Rules; Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. No Trial Set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/21/2020. (Hernandez, M) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 07/21 3:08 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/21/2020. The Court to issue Scheduling Conference Order. NOTE: "SAB Chambers Procedures" emailed to the parties. Plaintiffs Counsel Carmine Zarlenga by telephone. Defendants Counsel Lloyd Eisenberg by telephone. Court Reporter/CD Number: By telephone - off record. (Hernandez, M) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Scheduling Report
Tue 07/14 4:28 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by 3M Company. (Zarlenga, Carmine) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Statement
Mon 07/13 8:23 AM
STATEMENT of Report Per Stipulation and Order filed by Defendants RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC filed by Defendants RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC re23 Stipulation and Order. (Eisenberg, Lloyd) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Statement
Wed 06/03 6:59 PM
STATEMENT of Report Per Stipulation and Order filed by Defendants RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC re23 Stipulation and Order. (Eisenberg, Lloyd) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
13
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/15 1:42 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC.(Eisenberg, Lloyd) |
|
Tuesday, May 12, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/12 6:10 AM
STIPULATION re8 Amended Complaint, Extending Defendants' Time to Answer to 05/15/2020 by RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC. (Eisenberg, Lloyd) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 05/08 4:21 PM
STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST RX2LIVE, LLC AND RX2LIVE, INC. signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on May 8, 2020. (Munoz, I) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 05/06 7:32 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Preliminary Injunction Against RX2Live, LLC and RX2Live, Inc. by 3M Company. (Zarlenga, Carmine) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Supplement
Mon 05/04 1:53 PM
SUPPLEMENT by RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC re20 Pro Hac Vice Order. (Eisenberg, Lloyd) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Fri 05/01 12:33 PM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/1/2020. Added attorney Lloyd M. Eisenberg, PHV for RX2Live, Inc. and Rx2Live, LL. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Thu 04/30 9:06 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by RX2Live, Inc., Rx2Live, LLC for attorney Lloyd M. Eisenberg to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Hastrup, John William added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8870812) (Hastrup, John) |
|
18 | 18
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Thu 04/30 6:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER14 ; AND ORDERING DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/30/2020. (Coffman, Lisa) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/30 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with the Court's April 28 Minute Order by 3M Company re 16 Minute Order,,,,,.(Zarlenga, Carmine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, April 28, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minute Order
Tue 04/28 9:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The court has received and reviewed the motion for a temporary restraining order (TRO)14 . Pursuant to this court's standing order4 -1, defendants shall have until noon on Thursday, April 30, 2020 to file any written opposition to the TRO motion. Depending on the content of any such filing, the court will determine whether a hearing is necessary. Alternatively, given the current judicial emergency in this district, which has been exacerbated by operational disruptions caused by the ongoing public health emergency, the parties are strongly encouraged to engage in efforts that would avoid the need for judicial intervention. (The court notes that plaintiff's filings indicate that it has yet to make any substantial effort to secure a stipulation or otherwise avoid the filing of this request for emergency injunctive relief.) If such efforts prove fruitful, the parties are instructed to inform the court immediately via email to both noneorders@caed.uscourts.gov and lcoffman@caed.uscourts.gov, so as to avoid the waste of judicial resources. In addition, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve this notice upon likely defense counsel (Joe Lipari of The Sultzer Law Group) via email with notice by telephone AND serve a copy on Defendants directly via the methods already used to serve copies of the TRO motion signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on April 28, 2020. (Munoz, I) |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/27 8:17 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: RX2Live, Inc. served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Zarlenga, Carmine) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Mon 04/27 6:46 PM
MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by 3M Company.(Zarlenga, Carmine) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of TRO, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Carmen R. Zarlenga, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 as to Carmen R. Zarlenga, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 2 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 3 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 4 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 5 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 6 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 7 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 8 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 9 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 10 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 11 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 12 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 13 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 14 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 15 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 16 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 17 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 18 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 19 as to Dale Giali, | ||
Att: 24 Declaration of Charles Stobbie, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 1 as to Charles Stobbie, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 2 as to Charles Stobbie, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 3 as to Charles Stobbie, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 4 as to Charles Stobbie, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 5 as to Charles Stobbie, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 6 as to Charles Stobbie, | ||
Att: 31 Declaration of David A. Crist, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit 1 as to David A. Crist, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit 2 as to David A. Crist, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit 3 as to David A. Crist, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit 4 as to David A. Crist, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit 5 as to David A. Crist, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit 6 as to David A. Crist, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit 7 as to David A. Crist, | ||
Att: 39 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 40 TRO Checklist, | ||
Att: 41 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/23 6:27 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: RX2Live, Inc. served on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Giali, Dale) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/23 6:24 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Rx2Live, LLC served on 4/15/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. (Giali, Dale) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/21 3:19 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Keri E. Borders on behalf of 3M Company. Attorney Borders, Keri E. added. (Borders, Keri) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/20 2:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by 3M Company re8 Amended Complaint,. (Giali, Dale) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons
Mon 04/20 9:33 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *RX2Live, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Carmine Zarlenga* *Mayer Brown LLP* *1999 K Street NW* *Washington, DC 20006*. (Flores, E) |
|
Sunday, April 19, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Sun 04/19 5:44 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rx2Live, LLC, RX2Live, Inc. by 3M Company.(Zarlenga, Carmine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Revised Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Tue 04/14 11:59 AM
ORDER GRANTING6 Pro Hac Vice Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/2020. Added attorney Carmine Zarlenga for 3M Company. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Mon 04/13 6:50 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by 3M Company for attorney Carmine R. Zarlenga to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8841450) (Giali, Dale) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons
Mon 04/13 2:13 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rx2Live, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dale Joseph Giali* *Mayer Brown LLP* *350 South Grand Ave., 25th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Rivera, O) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Trademark New Case Documents for Unassigned DJ
Mon 04/13 2:06 PM
TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 3,398,329 * * 03/18/2008 * * 3M Company * Trademark #2:* 2,793,534 * * 12/16/2003 * * 3M Company * ; copy of Complaint and Trademark Report emailed to U.S. Office of Patents and Trademarks. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Rivera, O) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, | ||
Att: 3 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 4 Trademark Report, | ||
Att: 5 VDRP | ||
Friday, April 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Dertermination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Form AO 120) by 3M Company. (Giali, Dale) | |
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff 3M Company. (Giali, Dale) | |
1 | 1 25 pgs COMPLAINT against Rx2Live, LLC by 3M Company. Attorney Giali, Dale Joseph added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8838769)(Giali, Dale) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet |