3M Company v. Geftico, LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Gregory J Kelly |
Case #: | 6:20-cv-00648 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 11, 2020 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Geftico, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Mon 06/01 11:48 AM
Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (SPM) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/15 1:23 PM
ORDER- The Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 16) is DISSOLVED. The bond filed with this Court (Doc. 24) is DISCHARGED. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/15/2020. (MEH) ctp |
|
33 | 33
order
*Order no pdf
Fri 05/15 9:00 AM
ENDORSED ORDER canceling the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for May 15, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/15/2020. (TNP) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
notice
Notice of voluntary dismissal
Thu 05/14 6:13 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal with prejudice by 3M Company (Wasserkrug, Joseph) Modified on 5/15/2020 (SPM). |
|
31 | 31
1
pgs
notice
Notice of settlement
Thu 05/14 6:11 PM
Joint NOTICE of settlement by 3M Company (Wasserkrug, Joseph) Modified on 5/15/2020 (SPM). |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 05/13 5:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re20 Interested persons order by Geftico, LLC. (Banks, Brandon) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 05/13 5:27 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Geftico, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Banks, Brandon) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
order
*Order pdf
Mon 05/11 3:22 PM
ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/11/2020. (MB) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of appearance
Mon 05/11 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance by Brian Michael Walsh on behalf of Geftico, LLC (Walsh, Brian) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
21
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition
Fri 05/08 4:15 PM
MEMORANDUM in opposition re11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,12 Declaration,13 Declaration filed by Geftico, LLC.(Banks, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
25 | 25
23
pgs
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 05/08 3:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Geftico, LLC. (Banks, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Bond
Wed 05/06 3:57 PM
SURETY BOND (No.190O43975) in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by 3M Company (DMA) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/05 1:29 PM
ORDER for Michael W. Weaver to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/5/2020. (MEH) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of rescheduling hearing
Tue 05/05 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Evidentiary Hearing hearing previously scheduled for 05/07/2020 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (MEH) |
|
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 05/05 12:26 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Continue. Due to the evidentiary nature of the preliminary injunction hearing, the Court will deny Defendant's request that the hearing occur via Zoom. The hearing will be in person and the parties shall appear in Courtroom 5B, George C. Young United States Courthouse Annex, 401 W. Central Boulevard, Orlando, Florida before the Honorable Carlos E Mendoza. The Temporary Restraining Order entered on April 30, 2020 (Doc. 16) shall remain in effect up to and including May 15, 2020. Hearing will be set by separate notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/5/2020. (MEH) |
|
20 | 20
order
Interested persons order
Tue 05/05 9:32 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER TO DEFENDANT- Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/19/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/5/2020. (MEH) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Continue
Mon 05/04 11:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue , Reschedule, or Postpone Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Geftico, LLC.(Banks, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of appearance
Mon 05/04 11:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Wayne Banks on behalf of Geftico, LLC (Banks, Brandon) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of hearing
Fri 05/01 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Evidentiary Hearing: re:16 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/7/2020 at 1:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. (MEH) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 04/30 5:53 PM
ORDER granting in part and deferring ruling in part 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/30/2020. (KMS) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Thu 04/30 10:18 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by 3M Company. Related case(s): no (Wasserkrug, Joseph) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Thu 04/30 10:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re7 Interested persons order by 3M Company. (Wasserkrug, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration
Wed 04/29 5:48 PM
DECLARATION of David A. Crist re11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by 3M Company.(Wasserkrug, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 3M Porfolio, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 3M Brand List, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - 3M Products and Materials, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 3M Registration '329, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 3M Decl. of Incontestability for Reg. '329, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - 3M Registration '534, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - 3M Notice of Acknowledgement for Reg. '534, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - 3M Registration '903, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - March 31, 2020 Email and Presentation, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - April 6, 2020 Email, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - April 7, 2020 Email Lorimer Request, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - April 7, 2020 Email Defendant Response, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - April 8, 2020 Email | ||
12 | 12
misc
Declaration
Wed 04/29 5:42 PM
DECLARATION of Charles Stobbie re11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by 3M Company.(Wasserkrug, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 3M Global Output, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 3M Production of 35 Million Respirators, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 -3M Healthcare Worker Respirators, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Mike Roman Letter to AG Barr, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 3M List Price, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Price Gouging and Counterfeiting Form, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - March 31, 2020 Email and Presentation, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - April 6, 2020 Email, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - April 7, 2020 Email Lorimer Request, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - April 7, 2020 Email Defendant Response, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - April 8, 2020 Email | ||
11 | 11
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 04/29 5:36 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by 3M Company.(Wasserkrug, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - SDNY Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction against Performance Supply, LLC | ||
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/24 12:43 PM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Michael W. Weaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 4/24/2020. (Smith, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/22 1:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Michael W. Weaver to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16730984 for $150 by 3M Company. (Wasserkrug, Joseph) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
*Order no pdf
Fri 04/17 8:46 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/17/2020. (MEH) |
|
7 | 7
order
Interested persons order
Fri 04/17 8:45 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/17/2020. (MEH) |
|
6 | 6
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Fri 04/17 8:42 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/17/2020. (MEH) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons issued
Wed 04/15 10:01 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Geftico, LLC. (SPM) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to counsel of Local Rule
Wed 04/15 9:59 AM
NOTICE to counsel Michael W. Weaver of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPM) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Wed 04/15 9:57 AM
Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (SPM) (SPM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L | ||
Att: 13 (4/15/2020) Main Document | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/15 9:10 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-648-Orl-41GJK. (SJB) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
30+
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/14 6:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Geftico, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16703397) filed by 3M Company.(Wasserkrug, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 3M Press Release, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 3M Publication, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 3M Trademark Principal Register No. 3398329, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 3M Trademark Principal Register No. 2793534, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 3M "Science Applied to Life" Trademark Principal Register No. 5469903, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 3M Website List Price for 3M-brand N95 Respirators, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - 3M Website Form for Reporting Suspected Incidents of Price Gouging, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - (Composite Exhibit) Defendant's PowerPoint Presentation Titled "masks", | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Defendant's April 6, 2020 Email to Lorimer, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Lorimer's April 7, 2020 Email to Defendant, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Defendant's April 7, 2020 Response to Lorimer, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Defendant's April 8, 2020 Response to Lorimer, | ||
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Summons Summons in a Civil Action |