Seliger v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alvin K Hellerstein |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-03031 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 11, 2020 5:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
NBCUniversal Media, LLC
a Delaware Limited Liability Company 30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Seliger
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 17, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/17 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Does, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Document filed by Mark Seliger. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Wed 07/22 9:26 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 7/22/20 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (yv) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 07/22 9:19 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:17 Notice of Settlement filed by Mark Seliger. ENDORSEMENT : A suggestion of settlement having been made, it is ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall mark this matter closed and all pending motions denied as moot; provided, however, that if settlement is not consummated within 60 days of the date of this Order, either party may apply by letter within the 60-day period for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/22/20) (yv) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 07/21 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 07/07 2:42 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. The extension request is so ordered. (NBCUniversal Media, LLC answer due 7/23/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/7/20) (yv) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/07 1:01 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mark Lerner dated 7/7/2020. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 06/22 3:50 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. So ordered. (NBCUniversal Media, LLC answer due 7/9/2020.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/22/20) (yv) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 06/22 12:59 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Request an extension of Defendants time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to July 9, 2020 addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mark Lerner dated June 22, 2020. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 06/03 12:46 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:11 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mark Lerner dated June 2, 2020 re: Request an extension of Defendants time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to June 25, 2020. Document filed by NBCUniversal Med ia, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. NBCUniversal Media, LLC answer due 6/25/2020. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2020) (rjm) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 06/02 4:39 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mark Lerner dated June 2, 2020 re: Request an extension of Defendants time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to June 25, 2020. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/02 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alanna B. Newman on behalf of NBCUniversal Media, LLC..(Newman, Alanna) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/02 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Alan Lerner on behalf of NBCUniversal Media, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 05/15 2:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. NBCUniversal Media, LLC served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez, c/o CT Corporation, Registered Agent for Service. Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
48
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/15 12:02 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Does, NBCUniversal Media, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mark Seliger. Related document:1 Complaint..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/15 10:10 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Does, NBCUniversal Media, LLC..(pne) |
|
5 | 5
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Wed 04/15 10:09 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pne) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 04/15 10:08 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pne) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/15 10:08 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pne) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/15 10:08 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne) |
||
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/14 9:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; and DOES 1-10, inclusive, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Tue 04/14 9:27 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/14 9:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burroughs, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/14 9:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Does, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19444549)Document filed by Mark Seliger..(Burroughs, Scott) |