Edwards v. Equitable Acceptance Corp.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Lioi |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00888 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:227 Violation of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act/Junk Fax Prevention Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 15, 2014 12:25 AM EST |
Counter-Claimant
Equitable Acceptance Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Counter-Defendant
Brian Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Equitable Acceptance Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Edwards
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 08 2015
Memorandum of Opinion and Order denying plaintiff's Motion to dismiss (Related Doc # 7) defendant's counterclaims. Judge Lesley Wells(C,KA) |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 12/29 2:53 PM
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel as follows that, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the above-captioned action, including all claims and counterclaims, is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and without costs to any party. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. . Judge Sara Lioi on 12/29/2015. (P,J) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Stipulation
Tue 12/29 2:13 PM
Amended Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brian Edwards. (Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Stipulation
Wed 12/23 4:44 PM
Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Brian Edwards. (Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Fri 10/16 8:13 AM
Notice [non-document]: The telephone conference set for 12/16/2015 is canceled and rescheduled for 2/4/2016 at 1:00 PM before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. (P,J) |
||
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Initial Order
Thu 10/08 8:44 AM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/8/2015. (P,J) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 10/07 12:17 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2015-12 Judge Sara Lioi randomly assigned to case. (K,K) |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Case Management Conference Plan/Order
Tue 07/28 11:46 AM
Case Management Conference Plan and scheduling notice. Standard Track. Fact Discovery due by 1/28/2016. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 12/5/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 3/28/2016, Telephonic status Conference set for 12/16/2015 at 10:00 AM. Judge Lesley Wells (C,KA) |
|
minutes
Case Management Conference
Tue 07/28 10:57 AM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Case Management Conference held on 7/28/2015. Case is assigned to the standard track. Participants included attorneys Jenny DeFrancisco for the plaintiff and Daniel Hill for the defendant. (M,JM) |
||
order
Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/28 11:40 AM
Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Jenny D. DeFrancisco is added as counsel for the Plaintiff Brian Edwards. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. . Judge Lesley Wells on 7/28/15.(C,LS) |
||
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/27 5:03 PM
Motion for attorney Jenny DeFrancisco to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7200179, filed by Plaintiff Brian Edwards.(Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jenny DeFrancisco, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Tue 07/14 10:45 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Brian Edwards. (Lemberg, Sergei) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 07/14 10:26 AM
Set Deadlines and Hearings with case management conference to be held on 7/28/2015 at 10:30 AM, to be held telephonically before Judge Lesley Wells. (C,LS) |
||
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion to attend by telephone
Wed 07/08 12:14 PM
Order [non-document]Granting Joint Motion for permission to hold the Case Management Conference Telephonically on July 28, 2015. The Court will initiate the conference call. . Judge Lesley Wells on 7/8/2015.(C,LS) |
||
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Mon 07/06 10:09 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 7/28/2015 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 328 before Judge Lesley Wells. (NOTE LOCATION: Chambers of Judge Lesley Wells, 201 Superior Avenue, Cleveland, Ohio). Judge Lesley Wells on 7/6/2015. (C,LS) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Mon 06/29 3:01 PM
Notice [non-document] the Case Management Conference scheduled for July 7, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. has been cancelled. The Case Management Conference will be rescheduled by separate Order. (A,K) |
||
Wednesday, June 10, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Relief
Wed 06/10 2:02 PM
Joint Motion for relief for Permission to Participate at the Scheduled Case Management Conference Telephonically filed by Defendant Equitable Acceptance Corp..(Hill, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Permission for the Parties to Participate at the Scheduled Case Management Conference Telephonically | ||
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
order
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Tue 06/09 9:27 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order . A case management conference will be held on 7/7/2015 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 328 before Judge Lesley Wells. (NOTE LOCATION: 328 Metzenbaum United States Court House, 201 Superior Avenue, Cleveland, Ohio). Judge Lesley Wells on 6/9/2015. (C,LS) |
||
Monday, June 08, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to dismiss
Mon 06/08 11:37 AM
Memorandum of Opinion and Order denying plaintiff's Motion to dismiss defendant's counterclaims. Judge Lesley Wells(C,KA) |
|
Friday, August 15, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 Reply in further support of7 Motion to dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Brian Edwards. (Lemberg, Sergei) Modified text on 8/18/2014 (S,R). | |
Tuesday, August 05, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Opposition to7 Motion to dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Equitable Acceptance Corp..(Hill, Daniel) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - J&L Marketing, Inc. v. Joseph, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Jenkins v. United Collection Bureau, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Castleberry v. Daimler Chrysler Truck Financial, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Wilson v. Discover Bank | ||
Tuesday, July 22, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Proposed Stipulation for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's motion to dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Ross, David) | |
Stipulation & Order (Non Document) . Order granting stipulated extension of time. . Defendant Equitable Acceptance Corporation shall have until 8/11/2014 to respond to plaintiff's motion to dismiss. Judge Lesley Wells on 7/22/2014. (C,LS) | ||
Monday, July 21, 2014 | ||
Stipulation & Order (Non Document). Order granting stipulated extension of time. Defendants are granted an extension of time until 7/27/2014 to respond to plaintiff's motion to dismiss. . Judge Lesley Wells on 7/21/2014. (C,LS) | ||
Friday, July 18, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Ross, David) | |
Monday, July 07, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 Motion to dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Brian Edwards, Counter-Defendant Brian Edwards.(Lemberg, Sergei) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Wednesday, June 18, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaim until July 7, 2014 filed by Plaintiff Brian Edwards, Counter-Defendant Brian Edwards. Related document(s)4 .(Lemberg, Sergei) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Order [non-document] granting6 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaim until July 7, 2014,4 . Judge Lesley Wells on 06/18/2014.(A,K) | ||
Monday, June 02, 2014 | ||
Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Daniel D. Hill is added as counsel for Equitable Acceptance Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. . Judge Lesley Wells on 06/02/2014.(C,LS) | ||
Thursday, May 29, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Motion for attorney Daniel Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6565248, filed by Defendant Equitable Acceptance Corp..(Ross, David) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Hill, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Hill | ||
Notice to Attorney Daniel D. Hill. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s)4 . (G,CA) | ||
Wednesday, May 28, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Answer to1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Brian Edwards filed by Equitable Acceptance Corp.. (Ross, David) | |
3 | 3 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Equitable Acceptance Corp. on 5/20/2014, filed on behalf of Brian Edwards (Lemberg, Sergei) | |
Thursday, April 24, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Equitable Acceptance Corp. (C,B) | |
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
1 | 1 Complaint with jury demand against Equitable Acceptance Corp.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-6513758. Filed by Brian Edwards. (Lemberg, Sergei) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Judge Lesley Wells assigned to case. (C,B) | ||
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Vecchiarelli. (C,B) |