Wildgrass Oil and Gas v. State of Colorado, et al
Original Case: 1:19-cv-00190
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01151 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2021 2:57 AM MST |
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF COLORADO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JARED POLIS, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
COLORADO OIL AND GAS CONSERVATION COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JEFFREY ROBBINS, in his official capacity as Director of the Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
COLORADO OIL AND GAS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Intervenor
COLORADO OIL AND GAS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Intervenor
AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILDGRASS OIL AND GAS COMMITTEE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 01 2021
[10804185] Affirmed;Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Lucero, author; McHugh and Carson. Mandate to issue. [20-1151] |
Docket last updated: 02/04/2021 2:57 AM MST |
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
[10733863] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/16/2020. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 05/01/2020 for Wildgrass Oil and Gas Committee. Notice of appearance due on 05/01/2020 for Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation Commission, Jared Polis, Jeffrey Robbins, State of Colorado. 20-1151 | ||
Att: 1 44 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |