Alcantara et al v. Archambeault et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dana M Sabraw |
Referred: | Allison H Goddard |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-00756 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 28:2241fd Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday May 15, 2020 11:25 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Mary Doe
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Maria Flor Calderon Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Yasmani Osorio Reyna
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Matthew T. Albence
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Gregory J. Archambeault
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
James Dobson
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Christopher J. LaRose
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Warden LaRose
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Sixto Marrero
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Jesus Reyna
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Chad Wolf
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
268 | 268
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 03/20 11:38 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' motion to dismiss the case as moot is granted. (jpp) |
|
267 | 267
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 03/20 11:29 AM
ORDER (1) Granting Defendants' motion to dismiss and (2) Denying as moot Defendants' motion to decertify sublass. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/20/2024. (jpp) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
265 | 265
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal
Fri 03/15 10:23 AM
ORDER granting252 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/15/2024. (jpp) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
264 | 264
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 03/14 11:10 AM
ORDER setting Case Management Conference for 4/2/2024 at 1:15pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 3/14/2024.(jpp) |