Conduent Business Services, LLC v. Skyview Capital, LLC
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard P Stark |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00546 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, 20-00232-JTL |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 20, 2020 5:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
Skyview Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conduent Business Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/05 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Conduent Business Services, LLC as to Skyview Capital, LLC (Artese, Peter) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Civil
Mon 05/11 3:01 PM
CASE CLOSED (ntl) |
||
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 04/30 4:39 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Skyview Capital, LLC. (Chuff, Christopher) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Thu 04/30 4:16 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Skyview Capital, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/14/2020.(Chuff, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss/Fail to State Claim
Thu 04/30 4:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Skyview Capital, LLC.(Chuff, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Rule 7.1.1 Certification | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 04/30 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Public Version of Sealed Documents Filed on April 23, 2020 by Skyview Capital, LLC re4 Exhibit to a Document,2 Exhibit to a Document(Chuff, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/29 11:01 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Thu 04/23 3:57 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Exhibit 1, Exhibit 2, and Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/23/2020. (lak) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Thu 04/23 3:21 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Thu 04/23 3:20 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Skyview Capital, LLC. (lak) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Exhibit to a Document
Thu 04/23 3:18 PM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT A to3 Notice of Removal - filed by Skyview Capital, LLC. (lak) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/23 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from The Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, Case Number 2020-0232-JTL (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2905848) - filed by Skyview Capital, LLC. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit to a Document
Thu 04/23 3:12 PM
[SEALED] EXHIBIT 1 and EXHIBIT 2 to1 MOTION to Seal - filed by Skyview Capital, LLC. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 2 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Seal
Thu 04/23 3:10 PM
MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1, Exhibit 2, and Exhibit A - filed by Skyview Capital, LLC. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Remark
Thu 04/23 3:22 PM
Remark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge (MN). (lak) |
||
utility
Remark
Thu 04/23 3:58 PM
Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (lak) |