Trader v. SeatGeek, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John P Cronan |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-03248 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 21, 2020 5:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
SeatGeek, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lindsey Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dustin Snyder
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
William Trader
Terminated: 05/19/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |