Duncan et al v. Aliera Companies, Inc. et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Troy L Nunley |
Referred: | Kendall J Newman |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00867 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Jun 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 25, 2020 1:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Trinity Healthshare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aliera Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OneShare Health, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corlyn Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
129 | 129
12
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/16 1:23 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/12/24 GRANTING115 Motion for Approval and116 Motion for Attorney Fees. Class Counsel are AWARDED attorney fees of 28% of the Settlement Fund and litigation costs of $61,521.42. Case contribution awards of $10,000 each to Named Plaintiffs Corlyn and Bruce Duncan, Rebecca White, Ellen Larson, Jaime and Jared Beard, Hanna Albina, and Austin Willard shall be awarded. Class Counsel is ORDERED to submit a Final Report in accordance with the Agreement and this Order. (Licea Chavez, V) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
128 | 128
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 01/11 2:29 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/11/2024. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTED Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval and Class Action Settlement (ECF No.115 ) and Motion for Attorney Fees (ECF No.116 ). A written order to issue. Plaintiffs Counsel Nina Wasow and James Varellas Present, and Eleanor Hamburger appearing Telephonically. Defendants Counsel Shane Smith Present, and Kyle Wallace appearing Telephonically. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Krueger, M) |