COUNTY OF BUTLER et al v. THOMAS W. WOLF et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | William S Stickman |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00677 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 03, 2020 3:24 AM EST |
Amicus
EAGLE FORUM EDUCATION & LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RACHEL LEVINE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THOMAS W. WOLF
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JEFFREY CUTLER
P.O. Box 2806
York, PA 17405 |
|
Plaintiff
DARYL METCALFE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIM BONNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN SCHOEFFEL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PRIMA CAPELLI, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARCI MUSTELLO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MIKE KELLY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CATHY HOSKINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NANCY GIFFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MIKE GIFFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL F. CRAWFORD
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
COUNTY OF BUTLER
Terminated: 09/14/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COUNTY OF FAYETTE
Terminated: 09/14/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COUNTY OF WASHINGTON
Terminated: 09/14/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COUNTY OF GREENE
Terminated: 09/14/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
107 | 107
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Thu 09/16 9:15 AM
ORDER DENYING106 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/16/21. (eca) |
|
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
106 | 106
motion
Reopen Case
Fri 09/10 3:31 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by COUNTY OF BUTLER, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, COUNTY OF GREENE, COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, PAUL F. CRAWFORD, MIKE GIFFORD, NANCY GIFFORD, CATHY HOSKINS, MIKE KELLY, DARYL METCALFE, MARCI MUSTELLO, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC, STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.. (Elliott, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |