Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-10979
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-10979
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:14-bk-11008 |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | Over 100,000 |
Est. Assets | More than $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC
Energy Plaza 1601 Bryan Street
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago |
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
order
Final Decree
Thu 11/18 10:04 AM
Final Decree (A) Closing the debtors' remaining Chapter 11 Cases, (B) Terminating Claims and Noticing Services, and (C) Granting related relief. Signed on 11/17/2021 (DMC) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 11/18 11:03 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (DMC) |
||
Friday, September 26, 2014 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Fri 09/26 9:07 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (Semmelman, Tyler) |
|
Monday, July 28, 2014 | ||
8 | 8
misc
List of Creditors
Tue 07/29 12:07 AM
List of Creditors Notice of Filing of Non-Consolidated Creditor Matrix of Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC (Case No. 14-11008 Filed by Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (Madron, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, June 30, 2014 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 06/30 9:35 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (Romanowicz, William) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 06/30 8:14 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (Semmelman, Tyler) |
|
Thursday, June 05, 2014 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order-Joint Admin
Thu 06/05 6:44 PM
Order (FINAL) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. Order Signed on 6/5/14 (LB) |
|
Thursday, May 01, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Order (INTERIM) Directing Joint Administration of The Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. Order Signed on 5/1/2014. An Order Has Been Entered Directing The Joint Administration of The Chapter 11 Cases of Energy Future Holdings Corp.; Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC; 4Change Energy Company; 4Change Energy Holdings LLC; Big Brown 3 Power Company LLC; Big Brown Lignite Company LLC; Big Brown Power Company LLC; Brighten Energy LLC; Brighten Holdings LLC; Collin Power Company LLC; Dallas Power & Light Company, Inc.; DeCordova II Power Company LLC; DeCordova Power Company LLC; Eagle Mountain Power Company LLC; Ebasco Services of Canada Limited; EEC Holdings, Inc.; EECI, Inc.; EFH Australia (No.2) Holdings Company; EFH CG Holdings Company LP; EFH CG Management Company LLC; EFH Corporate Services Company; EFH Finance (No.2) Holdings Company; EFH FS Holdings Company; EFH Renewables Company LLC; EFIH Finance Inc.; Energy Future Competitive Holdings Company LLC; Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC; Generation Development Company LLC; Generation MT Company LLC; Generation SVC Company; Lake Creek 3 Power Company LLC; Lone Star Energy Company, Inc.; Lone Star Pipeline Company, Inc.; LSGT Gas Company LLC; LSGT SACROC, Inc.; Luminant Big Brown Mining Company LLC; Luminant Energy Company LLC; Luminant Energy Trading California Company; Luminant ET Services Company; Luminant Generation Company LLC; Luminant Holding Company LLC; Luminant Mineral Development Company LLC; Luminant Mining Company LLC; Luminant Renewables Company LLC; Martin Lake 4 Power Company LLC; Monticello 4 Power Company LLC; Morgan Creek 7 Power Company LLC; NCA Development Company LLC; NCA Resources Development Company LLC; Oak Grove Management Company LLC; Oak Grove Mining Company LLC; Oak Grove Power Company LLC; Sandow Power Company LLC; Southwestern Electric Service Company, Inc.; TCEH Finance, Inc,; Texas Electric Service Company, Inc,; Texas Energy Industries Company, Inc,; Texas Power & Light Company, Inc.; Texas Utilities Company, Inc.; Texas Utilities Electric Company, Inc.; Tradinghouse 3 & 4 Power Company LLC; Tradinghouse Power Company LLC; TXU Electric Company, Inc.; TXU Energy Receivables Company; TXU Energy Retail Company LLC; TXU Energy Solutions Company LLC; TXU Receivables Company; TXU Retail Services Company; TXU SEM Company; Valley NG Power Company LLC; Valley Power Company LLC. All Further Pleadings And Other Papers Shall Be Filed In, And All Further Docket Entries Shall Be Made In, Case No. 14-10979 (JohnstonJ, Julie) | |
Tuesday, April 29, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Collin Power Company LLC, Dallas Power & Light Company, Inc., DeCordova II Power Company LLC, EFH FS Holdings Company, EFH Finance (No. 2) Holdings Company, EFH Renewables Company LLC, EFIH Finance Inc., Energy Future Competitive Holdings Company LLC, Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC, Generation Development Company LLC, LSGT SACROC, Inc., Martin Lake 4 Power Company LLC, Monticello 4 Power Company LLC, Morgan Creek 7 Power Company LLC, NCA Development Company LLC, TXU Energy Solutions Company LLC, TXU Receivables Company, TXU Retail Services Company, TXU SEM Company, Valley NG Power Company LLC. (Madron, Jason) | |
2 | 2 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-11008 [misc,volp11a] (1213.00). Receipt Number 7056983, amount $1213.00. (U.S. Treasury) | |
1 | 1 32 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1213. Filed by Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) | |
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (JohnstonJ, Julie) |