19
|
|
19
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (pj)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
copy of order
|
18
|
|
18
ORDER TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))17 . Based upon the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice17 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice in itsentirety. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (pj)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Eclipse IP LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Woods, Tyler)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER Coordinating and Staying Cases by Judge George H. Wu: The Court was presiding over two cases filed by Eclipse IP LLC ("Eclipse"); Exlipse IP, LLC v. Dolls Kill, Inc., CV13-1855, and Eclipse IP, LLC v. PayByPhone Technologies, Inc., CV14-00154, and has accepted related case transfer of seven cases Eclipse filed involving an overlaping constellation of patents from the same family; Nos. 7,064,681; 7,113,110; 7,119,716; 7,319,414; 7,479,899; 7,482,952; 7,876,239; 8,232,899; 8,531,317; and 7,564,459. Those related cases are: 1. Eclipse IP LLC v. Safeway Inc., CV14-00376, 2. Eclipse IP LLC v. Tri Starr Management Services Inc., CV14-00578, 3. Eclipse IP LLC v. Dogeared Jewels and Gifts LLC, CV14-00643, 4. Eclipse IP LLC v. Vapour Organic Beauty Inc., CV14-00644, 5. Eclipse IP LLC v. Title 9 Sports Inc., CV14-00645, 6. Eclipse IP LLC v. Backcountry.com Inc., CV14-00646, 7. Eclipse IP LLC v. McKinley Equipment Corporation, CV14-00742. These nine related cases are collectively referred to as the "Eclipse Cases." All of the Eclipse cases that remain pending are hereby COORDINATED for case management purposes. The Eclipse Cases are hereby STAYED with the exception of the below-described activity. All pending motions are hereby taken off calendar, and, if appropriate, can be reinstated with any necessary modification once the stay is lifted. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a status report with the Court no later than 14 days after the filing of this Order, certifying service of this Order (attaching proof of service if not effected through CM/ECF), and providing two summary charts showing which defendants are alleged to infringe which claims of which patents; one organized by defendant, the other by patent and claim. The Court also VACATES the scheduling conference set for June 23, 2014 and sets a Status Conference for the Eclipse Cases on July 7, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. to discuss lifting the stay and future scheduling of matters in the actions. Parties may appear telephonically with advanced arrangement with the Court Clerk. (bp)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (See attached document for requirements.) (lom)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott J Ferrell counsel for Plaintiff Eclipse IP LLC. Filed by Plaintiff Eclipse IP LLC. (Ferrell, Scott)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 14-00154 GW(AJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi and Judge James V. Selna to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 14-00646 ODW(AJWx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/6/2014) (rn).
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Backcountry.com Inc answer now due 6/20/2014, filed by Plaintiff Eclipse IP LLC.(Woods, Tyler)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eclipse IP LLC, upon Defendant Backcountry.com Inc served on 5/1/2014, answer due 5/22/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alisha Mansell, CSC Lawyers Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Woods, Tyler)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/28/2014. Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2014 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Case transferred from Judge Margaret M. Morrow to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Case number now reads SACV 14-00646 JVS(JCGx). (rn)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Margaret M. Morrow is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at MMM_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Eclipse IP LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Eclipse IP LLC. (et) (mg).
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eclipse IP LLC. (et) (mg).
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery)1 as to Defendant Backcountry.com Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against Defendant Backcountry.com Inc. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Eclipse IP LLC. (et) (mg).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(4/28/2014) Notice of Assignment
|