Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:20-bk-11120
Case Filed:May 17, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Comcar Industries, Inc.
502 E Bridgers Ave
Auburndale, FL 33823-3721
Represented By
Stuart M. Brown
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
David L. Buchbinder
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Comcar files for Chapter 11, plans to sell five subsidiaries. (freightwaves.com)
Submitted Mon 05/18/2020
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
106 106 misc Exhibit Tue 05/26 7:00 PM
[SEALED] Exhibit(s) B to Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Debtors' Key Employee Retention Plan Related [+] Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-] 104 ,105
105 105 motion File Under Seal - Motion (B) Tue 05/26 6:57 PM
Motion to File Under Seal /Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Under Seal the Key Employee Retention Plan Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/12/2020. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
104 104 motion Authorize - Motion Tue 05/26 6:47 PM
Motion to Authorize / Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Debtors' Key Employee Retention Plan Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/12/2020. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
103 103 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Tue 05/26 12:17 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Re Affidavit of Service . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. Related [+] (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 2 ,3 ,4 ,6 ,7 ,8 ,9 ,10 ,11 ,13 ,14 ,21 ,22 ,60 ,61 ,62 ,73 ,77 ,80 ,81 ,82 ,83 ,84 ,85
Monday, May 25, 2020
102 102 utility Corrective Entry Mon 05/25 2:50 PM
Corrective Entry to Replace Image with Order Affixed on Correct Page Related [+] (BA)
Related: [-] 77 ,82
Saturday, May 23, 2020
101 101 crditcrd none Sat 05/23 3:50 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) 20-11120 LSS) [motion,msell] ( 181.00). Receipt Number 9787159, amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
100 100 order Appear pro hac vice Sat 05/23 1:41 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Inez M. Markovich Related [+] Order Signed on 5/23/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 95
99 99 order Appear pro hac vice Sat 05/23 1:41 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Mary Katherine Fackler. Related [+] Order Signed on 5/23/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 94
98 98 order Appear pro hac vice Sat 05/23 1:40 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Christian P. George Related [+] Order Signed on 5/23/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 93
97 97 court Standing Order/Transcripts Sat 05/23 11:31 AM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable Companies . Telephone number 302-654-8080 .. Related [+]
Related: [-] liable Companies
Friday, May 22, 2020
96 96 28 pgs motion Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f) - Motion (FEE) Fri 05/22 3:48 PM
Motion For Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)(FEE) / Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Sell Substantially All of the Assets of CCC Transportation, LLC and Commercial Truck and Trailer Sales, Inc. Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Other Interests; (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Sell Certain Real Estate and Improvements Thereon Located in Auburndale, Florida; (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Take All Actions Necessary to Consummate the Private Sale; (IV) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts; (V) Approving Bidder Protections; (VI) Approving Settlement; and (VII) Granting Related Relief Fee Amount $181 Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/19/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/12/2020. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit B
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit C
95 95 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 05/22 3:41 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Inez M. Markovich, Esquire of the law firm of McCarter & English, LLP to represent PLM Fleet, LLC f/k/a MAC Trailer Leasing, Inc. d/b/a PLM Trailer . Receipt Number 0311-28222, Filed by PLM Fleet, LLC f/k/a MAC Trailer Leasing, Inc. d/b/a PLM Trailer Leasing. (Rifino, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
94 94 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 05/21 3:48 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Mary Katherine Fackler . Receipt Number 2909922, Filed by CenterState Bank, N.A.. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
93 93 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 05/21 3:45 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Christian P. George . Receipt Number 2927021, Filed by CenterState Bank, N.A.. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
92 92 notice Appearance - Notice Thu 05/21 3:42 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by CenterState Bank, N.A.. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
91 91 notice Appearance - Notice Thu 05/21 1:05 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Florida Self-Insurers Guaranty Association, Inc.. (Sorenson, James)
Related: [-]
90 90 notice Appearance - Notice Thu 05/21 12:58 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by PLM Fleet, LLC f/k/a MAC Trailer Leasing, Inc. d/b/a PLM Trailer Leasing. (Rifino, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
89 89 utility Corrective Entry Thu 05/21 10:51 AM
Corrective Entry Related [+] (BA)
Related: [-] 74
88 88 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 05/21 9:32 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of the Notice of Agenda of Continued First Day Matters Scheduled for May 20, 2020 at 12:30 P.M. (EDT) (Docket No. 69) . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. Related [+] (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 69
87 87 misc Transcript Thu 05/21 8:53 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 5/19/2020 RE: first days. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/19/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, reliable, at Telephone number (302)654-8080. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/28/2020. Redaction Request Due By 6/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/22/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/19/2020. (GM)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Thu 05/21 3:43 PM
Attorney Katherine Fackler and Ian Connor Bifferato for CenterState Bank, N.A., Christian George and Ian Connor Bifferato for CenterState Bank, N.A. added to case Filed by CenterState Bank, N.A.. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
86 86 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/21 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/20/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29
85 85 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Wed 05/20 10:39 PM
Interim Order (A) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Obligations to Certain Critical Vendors and (B) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Critical Vendors Obligations Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 11
84 84 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Wed 05/20 10:38 PM
Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 10
83 83 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Wed 05/20 10:37 PM
Interim Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance Payment, (II) Establishing Procedures for Resolving Objections by Utility Companies, and (III) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 9
82 82 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Wed 05/20 10:36 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue Their Insurance Policies and Pay Prepetition Obligations in Respect Thereof and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 8
81 81 order Motion to File Under Seal Wed 05/20 10:35 PM
Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Under Seal Portions of the Debtors' Consolidated Creditor Matrix Containing Certain Individual Creditor Information Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 4
80 80 72 pgs order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Wed 05/20 2:36 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing Pursuant to Section 364 of the Bankruptcy Code, (II) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, (III) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code, (IV) Granting Liens and Superpriority Claims, (V) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (VI) Scheduling a Final Hearing Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 21
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 111 pgs Exhibit B
79 79 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/20 2:25 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Jeffrey M. Wolf Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 68
78 78 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/20 2:23 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Nan B. Braley Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 67
77 77 12 pgs order Order Wed 05/20 12:17 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtors' Cash Management System, (II) Authorizing Continued Intercompany Transfers Among Debtors and (III) Granting Related Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 14
76 76 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/20 11:54 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Stephen M. Blank Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 65
75 75 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/20 11:53 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Arthur J. Steinberg Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 64
74 74 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Wed 05/20 11:48 AM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtors' Cash Management System, (II) Authorizing Continued Intercompany Transfers Among Debtors and (III) Granting Related Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 14
73 73 order Motion to Pay Employee Wages Wed 05/20 11:46 AM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Wages and Compensation and Maintain and Continue Employee Benefit Programs and (II) Authorizing and Directing Banks and Certipay to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Employee Obligations Related [+] Order Signed on 5/20/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 13
72 72 misc Exhibit Wed 05/20 11:43 AM
Exhibit(s) / Notice of Filing Second Revised Order on Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing Pursuant to Section 364 of the Bankruptcy Code, (II) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, (III) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code, (IV) Granting Liens and Superpriority Claims, (V) Modifying Automatic Stay, and (VI) Scheduling a Final Hearing Related [+] Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-] 21
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
71 71 court Request for Transcript Wed 05/20 10:03 AM
Request for Transcript of hearing held on May 19, 2020 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable Companies , Telephone number 302-654-8080 Related [+].
Related: [-] 42 liable Companies
70 70 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Wed 05/20 9:21 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Receipt Number DEX033819, Filed by Navistar Leasing Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] inert, Ryan
69 69 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Wed 05/20 9:16 AM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing Related [+] Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2020 at 12:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
68 68 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/19 9:46 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Jeffrey M. Wolf . Receipt Number 2835387, Filed by Sterling National Bank. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
67 67 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/19 9:43 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nan B. Braley . Receipt Number 2940418, Filed by Sterling National Bank. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
66 66 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Tue 05/19 8:57 PM
Omnibus Certification of Counsel Regarding First Day Motion Related [+] Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-] 4 ,8 ,9 ,10 ,11 ,13 ,14
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L
Att: 13 Exhibit M
Att: 14 Exhibit N
65 65 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/19 8:24 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Stephen M. Blank of King & Spalding LLP . Receipt Number 2940311, Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
64 64 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/19 8:23 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Arthur J. Steinberg of King & Spalding LLP . Receipt Number 2940311, Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
63 63 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 05/19 8:16 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
62 62 order Employ (Application) Tue 05/19 2:51 PM
Order on Application of the Debtors for the Entry of An Order Appointing Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. as Claims and Noticing Agent Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Related [+] Order Signed on 5/19/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 7
61 61 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 05/19 2:49 PM
Order Authorizing the Debtors (I) to File a Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting a Separate Mailing Matrix for Each Debtor, and (II) File a Consolidated List of the Debtors' Thirty Largest Unsecured Creditors Related [+] Order Signed on 5/19/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 3
60 60 order Motion for Joint Administration Tue 05/19 2:37 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases [The Debtors in these chapter 11 cases, along with the last four digits of each Debtors federal tax identification number, are: 9th Place Newberry, LLC (0359); 16th Street Pompano Beach, LLC (0278); CCC Spotting, LLC (0342); CCC Transportation, LLC (1058); Charlotte Avenue Auburndale, LLC (2179); Coastal Transport, Inc. (2918); Coastal Transport Logistics, LLC (7544); Comcar Industries, Inc. (8221); Comcar Logistics, LLC (2338); Comcar Properties, Inc. (9545); Commercial Carrier Corporation (8582); Commercial Carrier Logistics, LLC (7544); Commercial Truck and Trailer Sales Inc. (0722); Cortez Blvd. Brooksville, LLC (2210); CT Transportation, LLC (0997); CTL Distribution, Inc. (7383); CTL Distribution Logistics, LLC (7506); CTL Transportation, LLC (0782); CTTS Leasing, LLC (7466); Detsco Terminals, Inc. (9958); Driver Services, Inc. (3846); East Broadway Tampa, LLC (2233); East Columbus Drive Tampa, LLC (3995); Fleet Maintenance Services, LLC (1410); MCT Transportation, LLC (0939); Midwest Coast Logistics, LLC (7411); Midwest Coast Transport, Inc. (0045); New Kings Road Jacksonville, LLC (4797); Old Winter Haven Road Auburndale, LLC (4738); W. Airport Blvd. Sanford, LLC (0462); Willis Shaw Logistics, LLC (7341); WSE Transportation, LLC. The corporate headquarters and the mailing address for the Debtors listed above is 8800 Baymeadows Way West, Suite 200, Jacksonville, Florida 32256. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Comcar Industries, Inc., Case No. 20-11120 (LSS), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-11120 (LSS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case.] Related [+] Order Signed on 5/19/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 2
59 59 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 05/19 2:18 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Harley E. Riedel Related [+] Order Signed on 5/19/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 45
58 58 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 05/19 2:11 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of David K. Bowsher Related [+] Order Signed on 5/19/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 56
57 57 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 05/19 2:10 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Timothy John Segers Related [+] Order Signed on 5/19/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 55
56 56 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/19 2:04 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David K. Bowsher . Receipt Number 2939056, Filed by CTT Acquisition, LLC, P&S Acquisition, LLC. (Angelo, Jason)
Related: [-]
55 55 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 05/19 2:02 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Timothy John Segers . Receipt Number 2939056, Filed by CTT Acquisition, LLC, P&S Acquisition, LLC. (Angelo, Jason)
Related: [-]
54 54 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 05/19 1:59 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by CTT Acquisition, LLC, P&S Acquisition, LLC. (Angelo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
53 53 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Tue 05/19 1:10 PM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing Related [+] Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-] 2 ,3 ,4 ,7 ,8 ,9 ,10 ,11 ,13 ,14 ,21
52 52 misc Exhibit Tue 05/19 12:30 PM
Exhibit(s) / Notice of Filing Revised Order on Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing Pursuant to Section 364 of the Bankruptcy Code, (II) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, (III) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code, (IV) Granting Liens and Superpriority Claims, (V) Modifying Automatic Stay, and (VI) Scheduling a Final Hearing Related [+] Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-] 21
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
51 51 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Tue 05/19 12:24 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of a)Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy Petitions and Related Pleadings; Notice and Agenda of Hearing on First Day Motions Scheduled for May 19, 2020 at 2:00 P.M (EDT) in Courtroom #2 (Docket No. 35); and b)Notice of Agenda of First Day Matters Scheduled for May 19, 2020 at 2:00 P.M. (EDT) (Docket No. 42). . Filed by Donlin Recano. Related [+] (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-] 35 ,42
50 50 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 05/19 12:03 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Navistar Leasing Company. (Adams, Eric)
Related: [-]
49 49 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 05/19 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Navistar Leasing Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] inert, Ryan
48 48 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 05/19 10:28 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Daniel R. Fogarty Related [+] Order Signed on 5/19/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 44
47 47 misc Amended Petition Tue 05/19 7:26 AM
Amended Petition to Update Form Related [+] Filed by Comcar Industries, Inc.. (Brown, Stuart)
Related: [-] 1
misc Add Attorney Tue 05/19 2:10 PM
Attorney David K. Bowsher and Jason Daniel Angelo for CTT Acquisition, LLC and P&S Acquisition, LLC, Timothy John Segers and Jason Daniel Angelo for CTT Acquisition, LLC and P&S Acquisition, LLC added to case Filed by CTT Acquisition, LLC, P&S Acquisition, LLC. (Angelo, Jason)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Tue 05/19 8:19 PM
Attorney Arthur Steinberg and Jason A. Gibson for Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates, Stephen Blank and Jason A. Gibson for Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates, Frederick B. Rosner and Jason A. Gibson for Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates added to case Filed by Luminus Energy Partners Master Fund, Ltd. and certain of its affiliates. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]