New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis A Kaplan
Case #: 1:20-cv-03829
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:May 18, 2020
Last checked: Thursday Aug 06, 2020 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Block.One
1701 Kraft Drive
Blacksburg, VA 24060
Represented By
Greg Donald Andres
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Neal Alan Potischman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Andrew Scott Gehring
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Antonio Mortez Haynes
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Gabriel Jaime- Bettan
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Edmund Polubinski, III
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Brian Edward Klein
Baker Marquart LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brendan Blumer
1701 Kraft Drive
Blacksburg, VA 24060
Defendant
Ian Grigg
Defendant
Daniel Larimer
Represented By
Greg Donald Andres
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Neal Alan Potischman
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Andrew Scott Gehring
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Antonio Mortez Haynes
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Gabriel Jaime- Bettan
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Edmund Polubinski, III
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (nyc)
contact info
Brian Edward Klein
Baker Marquart LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brock Pierce
Plaintiff
Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC
Represented By
Ievgeniia Vatrenko
contact info
Daniel Lawrence Berger
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Johnny Hong
Represented By
Daniel Lawrence Berger
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/21/2020 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
30 30 order Memo Endorsement Tue 08/18 9:57 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 60 in 20-CV-2809 NOTICE OF CRYPTO ASSETS OPPORTUNITY FUND LLC.'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FOR SERVICE: ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/18/2020) (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/05 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ievgeniia Vatrenko on behalf of Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC..(Vatrenko, Ievgeniia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
28 28 6 pgs order Order Tue 08/04 12:18 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [20 in 1:20-cv-02809-LAK] MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Co-Lead Counsel; granting [22 in 1:20-cv-02809-LAK] MOTION to Appoint Counsel; granting [22 in 1:20-cv-02809-LAK] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:20-cv-3829; granting [22 in 1:20-cv-02809-LAK] MOTION to Appoint Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC and Johnny Hong to serve as lead plaintiff(s). For all these reasons, Crypto assets' motion [Dkt. 22] is granted and the Williams Group's motion [Dkt. 20] is denied. Accordingly, these cases are consolidated. Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund, LLC is appointed Lead plaintiff. The firm of Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. is appointed Lead Counsel. Unless otherwise ordered, this order shall apply to any securities fraud against Block. One that subsequently may be 1led in or transferred to this Court. (And as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/4/2020) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Case Consolidation - Member Tue 08/04 4:51 PM
CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-02809-LAK.. (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/09 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Antonio Mortez Haynes on behalf of Block.One, Daniel Larimer..(Haynes, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
utility Case Accepted as Related Tue 06/23 10:59 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-02809-LAK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 06/23 11:00 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (ad)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 06/23 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
26 26 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/10 4:12 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Block.One..(Potischman, Neal)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/10 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabriel Jaime- Bettan on behalf of Block.One, Daniel Larimer..(Jaime- Bettan, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/10 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Scott Gehring on behalf of Block.One, Daniel Larimer..(Gehring, Andrew)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/10 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Greg Donald Andres on behalf of Block.One, Daniel Larimer..(Andres, Greg)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/10 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neal Alan Potischman on behalf of Block.One, Daniel Larimer..(Potischman, Neal)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/10 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edmund Polubinski, III on behalf of Block.One, Daniel Larimer..(Polubinski, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
20 20 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Mon 06/08 3:19 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC, Johnny Hong..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/08 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Edward Klein on behalf of Block.One, Daniel Larimer..(Klein, Brian)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/08 10:20 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Block.One waiver sent on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. Document filed by Johnny Hong; Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/28 9:16 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Daniel Larimer served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. Service was accepted by Daniel Larimer. Document filed by Johnny Hong; Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/28 9:14 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Block.One served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. Service was accepted by Richard Chaing, Registered Agent. Document filed by Johnny Hong; Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 05/20 3:33 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel Larimer..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
14 14 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/19 10:46 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel Larimer, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC, Johnny Hong..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Tue 05/19 10:39 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ian Grigg..(jgo)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 05/19 10:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brock Pierce..(jgo)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 05/19 10:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brendan Blumer..(jgo)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 05/19 10:37 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Block.One..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 05/19 10:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Lawrence Berger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 12:22; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:77; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 05/19 10:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Lawrence Berger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Johnny Hong; Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 05/19 10:27 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/19 10:29 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Tue 05/19 10:30 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis A. Kaplan as possibly related to 20-cv-2809. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/19 10:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel Lawrence Berger to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/18 10:35 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC, Johnny Hong..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/18 10:31 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brock Pierce, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC, Johnny Hong..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/18 10:29 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ian Grigg, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC, Johnny Hong..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/18 10:27 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel Larimer, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC, Johnny Hong..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/18 10:25 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brendan Blumer, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC, Johnny Hong..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/18 10:22 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Block.One, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC, Johnny Hong..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Mon 05/18 10:16 AM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-02809 (LAK). Document filed by Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC, Johnny Hong..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/18 10:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 50 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/18 10:08 AM
COMPLAINT against Block.One, Brendan Blumer, Ian Grigg, Daniel Larimer, Brock Pierce. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19867564)Document filed by Johnny Hong, Crypto Assets Opportunity Fund LLC..(Berger, Daniel)
Related: [-]