Greer v. Swift
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Referred: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-00436 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 17, 2020 2:50 AM CST |
Defendant
Taylor A. Swift
|
|
Plaintiff
Russell Greer
6885 South Redwood Road Apt. 801
West Jordan, UT 84084 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Entry of Judgment
Fri 01/15 5:08 PM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:14 Order Dismissing Case. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (ln) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Entry of Judgment
Fri 01/15 5:05 PM
****DISREGARD.**** ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:14 Order Dismissing Case.(xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (ln) Modified on 1/15/2021 (ln) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 01/15 5:03 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: On December 14, 2020, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation (Doc No.13 ), to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion for an Extension and for Alternative Service (Doc. No.12 ) is DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with Rule 58, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 01/15/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (ln) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendation
Mon 12/14 4:28 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Before the Court in this personal-injury action brought under the Court's diversity jurisdiction is pro se Plaintiff Russell Greer's motion to extend the time for service of process under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) and to permit alternative service. (Doc. No.12 .) The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Greer's motion for an extension and for alternative service (Doc. No.12 ) be DENIED and that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Rule 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/14/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ln) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 08/19 12:41 PM
MOTION MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME and MOTION for Alternative Service by Russell Greer.(mg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A - D | ||
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit
Tue 07/07 3:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Russell Greer. (mg) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 06/29 9:57 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Taylor A. Swift, filed by Russell Greer.(mg) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Leave
Mon 06/29 9:50 AM
ORDER: Before the Court in this civil action are pro se Plaintiff Russell Greer's motion to correct a clerical mistake (Doc. No.6 ) and motion for leave to file an amended complaint (Doc. No.7 ). Greer's motion to correct a clerical mistake (Doc. No.6 ) is therefore FOUND MOOT. Because Defendant Taylor A. Swift has not yet appeared and filed a responsive pleading, Greer may file an amended complaint as a matter of course without seeking the Court's leave. Greer's motion for leave to file an amended complaint (Doc. No.7 ) is therefore FOUND MOOT. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter Greer's proposed amended complaint (Doc. No. 7-1) as a separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/26/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/22 4:45 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: Russell Greer, a pro se Utah resident, filed a civil complaint (Doc. No.1 ) and paid the filing fee (Doc. No. 1-12). The plaintiff also filed a motion to correct clerical mistake (Doc. No.6 at 17), with an amended complaint (Doc. No.6 at 12-38), and a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint (Doc. No.7 ), with another amended complaint (Doc. No. 7-1 at 230). This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions. The plaintiff is responsible for effecting service of process on the defendant. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/22/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Leave
Thu 06/18 4:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Russell Greer.(mg) Modified on 6/18/2020 (mg) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Proposed Second Amended Complaint with Exhibits A - N, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment - Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment - Envelope | ||
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
39
pgs
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 06/01 11:41 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct by Russell Greer.(mg) Modified on 6/1/2020 (mg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A through H | ||
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 05/27 4:49 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to U.S. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger as a "Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:18-cv-00394. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/27/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Supplement
Tue 05/26 1:59 PM
SUPPLEMENT filed by Russell Greer re1 Complaint. (mg) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Fri 05/22 8:48 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) |
|
misc
Annotation - Docket
Fri 05/22 8:49 AM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg) |
||
Thursday, May 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/22 8:37 AM
Summons issued as to Taylor A. Swift. Service copies returned to Pro Se Party by regular mail. (mg) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/21 5:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Taylor A. Swift (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675058891), filed by Russell Greer.(mg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Tayor Swift - On Tour Miscellaneous Pics, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Verizon "looktothestars.org", | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Verizon "google.com", | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Verizon "Voicemail", | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Miscellaneous - google.com reddit.com, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Miscellaneous pic, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Flyer, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Mail, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Highland Springs Indv Com Note, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Verizon "kurn.org" communication, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Pic of Taylor Swift (Post - Followers), | ||
Att: 12 Attachment - Receipt |