UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC v. MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC et al
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | L Patrick Auld |
Referred: | L Patrick Auld |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00374 |
Nature of Suit | 130 Contract - Miller Act |
Cause | 40:3131 Miller Act |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 10:29 PM EST |
Counter Claimant
MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
MARTIN L. WHITE
|
|
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 09/19 1:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by A UNIQUE DRYWALL, L.L.C. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01155-LCB-LPA, 1:14-cv-00189-UA-LPA, 1:14-cv-00374-LPA, 1:14-cv-00565-LPA, 1:14-cv-00883-LCB-LPA. (STARK, THOMAS) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 05/26 8:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC. (OGBURN, THOMAS) |
|
Tuesday, March 31, 2015 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 03/31 9:19 AM
Motions Referred: RE:20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other
Tue 03/31 9:24 AM
TEXT ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall undertake mediation by 04/24/2015. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/31/2015. (AULD, L.) |
||
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time-Other
Mon 03/30 10:28 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC.(OGBURN, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation | ||
Saturday, March 21, 2015 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Sat 03/21 8:14 PM
MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD no longer assigned to case in role as referral judge. (Powell, Gloria) |
||
utility
Case Reassigned
Sat 03/21 8:15 PM
Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD as presider (see19 ). JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS no longer assigned to the case. (Powell, Gloria) |
||
Tuesday, March 03, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/03 3:15 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge L. PATRICK AULD to conduct all proceedings including a jury or nonjury trial, to order the entry of judgment, and to conduct all post-judgment proceedings therein. Signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 3/3/2015. (Daniel, J) |
|
Monday, February 23, 2015 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Judge
Mon 02/23 5:18 PM
CASE REFERRED RE: Order of Reference to USMJ to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS - (Williamson, Wanda) |
||
Monday, December 29, 2014 | ||
utility
Case Reassigned
Mon 12/29 12:21 AM
Case Reassigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. no longer assigned to the case. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00374-WO-LPA, 1:14-cv-00883-WO-LPA(Powell, Gloria) |
||
Monday, December 08, 2014 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Appointing Mediator
Mon 12/08 11:31 AM
ORDER Appointing MARTIN L. WHITE as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl) |
|
Wednesday, November 26, 2014 | ||
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. (Gammon, Cheryl) | ||
MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation due by 4/17/2015. (Gammon, Cheryl) | ||
Tuesday, November 25, 2014 | ||
TEXT ORDER adopting17 RULE 26F (JOINT) REPORT. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/25/2014. (AULD, L.) | ||
Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. Case-Management Track: Complex. Discovery due by 6/1/2015. Mediation should be conducted midway in the discovery period, the exact date to be set by the Mediator. The parties agree that the Mediator shall be Martin L. White, Johnston, Allison & Hord, P.A . Plaintiff(s) Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/10/2014. Defendant(s) Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2015. Both parties consent to reference of this case to a Magistrate Judge. ETT: four (4) days. A jury trial has NOT been demanded. (Daniel, J) | ||
Wednesday, November 12, 2014 | ||
Motions Referred: RE:17 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) | ||
Tuesday, November 11, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC.(OGBURN, THOMAS) | |
Tuesday, October 07, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/24/2014 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) | |
Tuesday, September 16, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TY EDWIN SHAFFER on behalf of Counter Claimants MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC, THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA, Defendants MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC, THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA (SHAFFER, TY) | |
Thursday, August 28, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 RESPONSE by Counter Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC re10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . (OGBURN, THOMAS) | |
Monday, August 04, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/4/2014; that MAP shall have up to and including August 29, 2014 within which to answer or otherwise respond to Defendants' counterclaim. Answer/Response to Counterclaim due by 8/29/2014. (Sheets, Jamie) | |
Friday, August 01, 2014 | ||
Motions Referred: RE:12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD - (Williamson, Wanda) | ||
Thursday, July 31, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC.(OGBURN, THOMAS) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 21, 2014 | ||
Motion Referred: re:11 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jacqueline Terry Hughes) and to Substitute Attorney (Edward F. Hennessey, IV) to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Welch, Kelly) | ||
TEXT ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney JACQUELINE TERRY HUGHES and the law firm of Womble Carlyle Sandridge and Rice, LLP, are terminated as counsel of record for Defendants. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/21/2014. (AULD, L.) | ||
Tuesday, July 15, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney EDWARD F. HENNESSEY, IV (Jacqueline Terry Hughes, withdrawing) , Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Edward F. Hennessey, IV () by on behalf of MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC, THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA.(HENNESSEY, EDWARD) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10 Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint and Counterclaim against Plaintiff. (HENNESSEY, EDWARD) Modified document title on 7/15/2014. (Daniel, J) | |
Monday, July 07, 2014 | ||
Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD as referral judge. (see 11cv1155 MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER no longer assigned to the case. (Powell, Gloria) | ||
Wednesday, June 18, 2014 | ||
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC. Answer due by 7/9/2014.Signed by Scott Crampton, Chief Deputy Clerk, on behalf of John Brubaker, Clerk of Court,on 6/18/14. (Crampton, Scott). | ||
Friday, June 13, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC, THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA.(HUGHES, JACQUELINE) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA (HUGHES, JACQUELINE) | |
7 | 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC (HUGHES, JACQUELINE) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JACQUELINE TERRY HUGHES on behalf of Defendants MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC, THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA (HUGHES, JACQUELINE) | |
Thursday, May 15, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC served on 5/8/2014, answer due 5/29/2014; THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA served on 5/9/2014, answer due 5/30/2014.(OGBURN, THOMAS) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mavcon Services of MI, LLC, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - The Guarantee Company of North America, USA | ||
Tuesday, May 06, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Garland, Leah) | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC, THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA. (Garland, Leah) | |
Att: 1 Summons to The Guarantee Company of North America USA | ||
Friday, May 02, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Cook and Boardman Group, LLC, Corporate Parent SBS Commercial Door & Hardware, LLC for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC.. (OGBURN, THOMAS) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against MAVCON SERVICES OF MI, LLC, THE GUARANTEE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA USA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-1504777.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF SBS/MARTIN ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS, LLC, a division of THE COOK & BOARDMAN GROUP, LLC.(OGBURN, THOMAS) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Credit Application, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Subcontract Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Payment Bond, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Notice and Proof of Delivery |