BENJAMIN v. JBS S.A. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John R Padova |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-02594 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, 200500370 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 29, 2020 4:02 AM EST |
Defendant
JBS S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JBS SOUDERTON, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JBS USA FOOD COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JBS USA HOLDINGS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PILGRIMS PRIDE CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FERDINAND BENJAMIN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
misc
Remark
Tue 02/16 9:46 AM
Certified Copies of Memorandum and Order dated 1/29/2021, along with docket entries, mailed to the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County on 2/16/2021. (md, ) |