Thomas v. City Schools of Decatur et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark H Cohen |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-02317 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1683 Prohibition against sex discrimination in education |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 25, 2020 5:08 AM EST |
Defendant
City Schools of Decatur
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. David Dude
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marcia Fowler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pascha Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
200 | 200
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 12/19 10:27 AM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Recovery of Costs Pending Appeal [Doc.198 ] is GRANTED, thereby STAYING consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Reduce Cost Award [Doc.198 ]. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Motion to Reduce Cost Award no later than fourteen (14) days from the date the Eleventh Circuit issues its mandate on Plaintiff's pending appeal, and Plaintiff may file her reply to Defendants' response no later than fourteen (14) days after the filing of Defendants' response. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/19/2023. (tmf) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
199 | 199
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 12/18 4:59 PM
RESPONSE re198 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief MOTION to Stay filed by City Schools of Decatur, David Dude, Marcia Fowler. (Young, Jill) |