Traxxas, L.P. v. Maclan Racing
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Referred: | Roy S Payne |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00181 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 02, 2020 3:32 AM CST |
Defendant
Maclan Racing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Traxxas, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 27, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Wed 10/28 9:04 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 10/28 9:01 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that all claims asserted in this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2020. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Tue 10/13 4:13 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Traxxas, L.P..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction
Wed 10/07 8:37 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/6/2020. (ch, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Permanent Injunction
Wed 09/30 5:35 PM
Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction : Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction by Traxxas, L.P..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 09/29 8:41 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/29/2020. (ch, ) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File
Mon 09/28 1:58 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File : Joint Motion for Extension of Stay and for Extension of Time to Submit Motion to Dismiss by Traxxas, L.P..(Coleman, Debra) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 08/27 11:23 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Stay. It is therefore ORDERED that all deadlines are STAYED for 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/27/2020. (klc, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Tue 08/25 5:06 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay : Joint Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay All Deadlines by Traxxas, L.P..(Coleman, Debra) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 08/19 8:15 AM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Maclan Racing to 9/11/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 08/18 5:13 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Maclan Racing.( Menhart, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 07/29 8:00 AM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Maclan Racing to 8/27/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 07/28 4:52 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Maclan Racing.( Menhart, Eric) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/27 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric Menhart on behalf of Maclan Racing. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7911722. (Menhart, Eric) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/24 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Traxxas, L.P.. Maclan Racing served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Davis, William) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/06 4:02 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) |
||
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/08 2:24 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Maclan Racing. (ch, ) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 06/08 2:16 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Coleman, Debra) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/08 2:11 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Traxxas, L.P. (Coleman, Debra) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/08 8:42 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Mon 06/08 8:43 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |
||
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 06/05 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Coleman on behalf of Traxxas, L.P. (Coleman, Debra) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/05 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT For Trademark Infringement, Unfair Competition, and Dilution, and Unjust Enrichment against Maclan Racing ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7825735.), filed by Traxxas, L.P..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - T-MAXX Registration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - MAXX Registration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - E-MAXX Registration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - MINI MAXX Registration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - X-MAXX Registration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - XMAXX Registration, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |