Justin Sanchez et al v. Los Angeles Department of Transportation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-05044 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 05, 2020 2:07 AM PST |
Defendant
City of Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Department of Transportation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Alejo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago |
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 08/02 11:16 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,29 , CCA # 21-55285 The judgment of this Court, entered May 23, 2022, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Opinion35 , and USCA Order and Amended Opinion36 , AFFIRMED.] (mat) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 07/11 11:53 AM
ORDER AND AMENDED OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals29 filed by Justin Sanchez, Eric Alejo. CCA # 21-55285 The decision of the district court is affirmed. (gk) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 05/23 4:28 PM
OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,29 filed by Justin Sanchez, Eric Alejo. CCA # 21-55285 The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
Designation of Record on Appeal
Tue 04/13 10:36 AM
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez re29 (Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 04/13 9:30 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other)32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect Event of Notice (Other) selected. Counsel is advised to e-file the document using the correct event located under Civil Events Other Filings Appeal Documents and select Designation of Record on Appeal. (car) |
|
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/07 5:45 AM
NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez. No Transcripts Are Being Ordered For Appeal (Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Fri 03/26 3:39 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-55285 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals29 as to Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
appeal
Representation Statement
Wed 03/24 2:58 PM
REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,29 . (Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
29 | 29
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Wed 03/24 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez. Appeal of Judgment,28 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30977732.)(Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Judgment | ||
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 02/24 11:03 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: This Court having granted Defendants the City of Los Angeles and the Los Angeles Department of Transportation's Motion to Dismiss with prejudice27 , IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs Justin Sanchez and Eric Alejo. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk) |
|
27 | 27
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 02/24 10:56 AM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court recognizes Plaintiffs' concern with the unprecedented breadth and scope of Defendants the City of Los Angeles and the Los Angeles Department of Transportation's (together "the City") location data collection. But that alone does not mean it violates their constitutional or statutory privacy rights. This is an issue that may be more appropriately addressed as a matter of public policy, which is not for this Court to opine. Therefore, the City's Motion to Dismiss18 is GRANTED as to all claims. A district court may dismiss a complaint without leave to amend if "the allegation of other facts consistent with the challenged pleading could not possibly cure the deficiency." Albrecht v. Lund, 845 F.2d 193, 195 (9th Cir. 1988) (citation and internal quotation marks omitted). Because the Court finds that amendment to add more facts would be futile, the action is DISMISSED with prejudice, without leave to amend. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 09/10 9:13 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6)18 presently scheduled for hearing on September 11, 2020, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 08/28 4:02 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 18 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Department of Transportation. (Goss, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Response
Fri 08/21 1:48 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchezto Request for Judicial Notice,19 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/21 1:22 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 18 filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez. (Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Tue 08/11 1:25 PM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation21 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss18 is continued to 9/11/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. The parties filed a stipulation on 8/6/2020 to extend an 8/7/2020 deadline to file opposition to the motion, apparently with the presumption that the Court would extend the deadline before the deadline expired. In the future, the parties shall avoid submitting requests for continuance or extension of time less than five court days prior to the expiration of the scheduled date or deadline. See Initial Standing Order at 11 (Doc. No. 11); Judge Gee's Procedures and Schedules at paragraph 7, United States District Court, Central District of California website. (gk) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Continue
Thu 08/06 12:20 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Motion to Dismiss Hearing Date from August 28, 2020 to September 11, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 18 filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez.(Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Fri 07/31 5:32 AM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey L. Goss in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 18 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Department of Transportation. (Goss, Jeffrey) |
|
19 | 19
misc
For Judicial Notice
Fri 07/31 5:30 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 18 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Department of Transportation.(Goss, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 07/31 5:23 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Department of Transportation. Motion set for hearing on 8/28/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attorney Jeffrey L Goss added to party Los Angeles Department of Transportation(pty:dft)) (Goss, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 06/23 9:13 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Attorney Jeffrey L Goss added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Goss, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 06/22 8:20 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Justin Sanchez, Eric Alejo, upon Defendant City of Los Angeles served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Octavia Smith, City Clerk, Authorized to Accept Service Served Under F.R.C.P. Rule 4 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Toohey, Timothy) |
|
15 | 15
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 06/22 8:18 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Justin Sanchez, Eric Alejo, upon Defendant Los Angeles Department of Transportation served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Octavia Smith, City Clerk, Authorized to Accept Service under F.R.C.P. Rule 4 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Toohey, Timothy) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 06/19 7:49 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents)13 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents)12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). The filer used the event, Proof of Service (subsequent documents), for docketing this filing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 06/18 1:16 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez, (Toohey, Timothy) |
|
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 06/18 1:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez, (Toohey, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 06/17 5:16 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) |
|
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 06/16 2:31 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 6/12/2020. The case number will now read CV 20-5044 DMG (AFMx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Fri 06/12 4:14 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-02746 DMG(AFMx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05044 DMG(AFMx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/08 11:18 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Department of Transportation. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 06/08 11:10 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 06/08 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 06/08 7:22 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez, (Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 06/08 6:37 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez. (Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 06/08 6:35 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-02746 (Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 06/08 6:33 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Eric Alejo, Justin Sanchez. (Tajsar, Mohammad) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/08 6:29 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26716862 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Justin Sanchez, Eric Alejo. (Attorney Mohammad K Tajsar added to party Eric Alejo(pty:pla), Attorney Mohammad K Tajsar added to party Justin Sanchez(pty:pla))(Tajsar, Mohammad) |