VITALIBIS, INC.
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | August B Landis |
Case #: | 2:20-bk-12865 |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2020 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 16, 2020 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Dismissed: | Sep 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
VITALIBIS, INC.
3960 Howard Hughes Pkwy Ste 500
Las Vegas, NV 89169-5988 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
167 | 167
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11 and Split/Transfer/Dismissed only)
Mon 09/20 2:16 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (mag) |