Hambacker et al v. WESTGATE RESORTS, LTD., L.P. et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen R Clark |
Case #: | 4:20-cv-00833 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 20, 2020 4:16 AM CST |
Defendant
CFI Resorts Management, Inc.
5601 Windhover Drive
Orlando, FL 32819 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Central Florida Investments, Inc.
5601 Windhover Drive
Orlando, FL 32819 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Westgate Resorts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC
5601 Windhover Drive
Orlando, FL 32819 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Berlingeri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Berlingeri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Bilski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephan Bilski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Blackston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Blackston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosetta Bledsoe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
gregory Borge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melinda Bowman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Bowman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Brady
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Verne Brady
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betsy Braga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Braga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lena Bronson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marion Bronson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheila Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Broyles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colleen Canning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Canning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Capek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martha Capek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Carden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Carden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Cash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Cash, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chantal Chapoteau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aubrey Charles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Charles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Newton Christman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Clay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lena Clay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Cleveringa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marilyn Cleveringa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Cochran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Cochran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Florence Coleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alva Collier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Collier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mathelda Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelia Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elmo Cook, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalind Creagan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Creagan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Crest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Crist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mona Crum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Crum Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Damron-Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Damron-Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Danbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Danbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Daniel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Darling Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Dash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dash
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randolph Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanne Day
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Delbene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pauline Dewitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Dewitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ahmet Dirican
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Dougherty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sylvia Dougherty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Downing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Downing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janiece Drassler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erma Dukes-Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maureen Dunn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Earl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Earl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Ector
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzette Ector
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harmon Edmond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Edmond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Farber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Farber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn Farr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rickey Farr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Fender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kellie Fender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marquies Fields
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josef Fila
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Fila
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Filger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Filger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Foley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Celestine Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Addie Freytag
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Gagliano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorene Gagliano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Garhartt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rose Garhartt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Priscilla Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherri Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharman Gingrich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jan Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis Gorman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norma Gorman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Greene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugenia Gruber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Gruber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Guernsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Guernsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Gutillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Gutillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Guzman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hambacker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veronica Hambacker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Hanauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Hanauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Harrah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Harrah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Hartman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudette Haskins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Haynes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Haynes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendell Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Holloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Holst
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Holst
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Horton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natividad Horton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delmer Huffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Huffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juanita Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jewel Jacobs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Jacobs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sidney Janise
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Jansen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Jansen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doris Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willis Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay Kasdorf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Kasdorf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edith Keys
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Keys
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Kraatz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Kraatz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Larson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doreen Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Helena Letsch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allison Lewandowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ann Lewandowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leverna Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Livingston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Livingston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Ludden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deanna Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Maguire
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Makovicka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Makovicka
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Marcoux
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nia Marsh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Marsh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maryann Mayo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie McCoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darrell McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Medina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mychel Medina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Mercer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Mercer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Mercer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Mercer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earnest Miner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melinda Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodger Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruth Morin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Althea Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Morrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delmire Morse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Morse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rose Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felipa Nieto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Nieto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Norman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elvin Norman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Irene Obera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Pedrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamora Pennell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Petrovic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Petrovic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Georgia Potaris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Potaris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grace Pratti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Pratti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Quade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Quade
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ida Quarterman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnnie Quarterman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rose Raney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Raper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willard Raper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey Ray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Ray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anya Rey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Rheaume
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Normand Rheaume
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamine Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gert Rohall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Rohall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Russ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Russ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donn Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Sadowsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Sadowsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresita Santiago
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Sellers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Olivia Sellers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Shaefer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Shaefer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anne Sheals
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marilyn Siegel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Siegel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dough Solsby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eva Solsby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Southwith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vicky Southwith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Stocks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilma Stocks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcel Tajchman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Umana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Umana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clara Villegas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Villegas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Voorhees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Voorhees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glinder Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Ward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheila Ward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn Watts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joann Weimer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Weimer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Wheeler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnnie Wiedeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margretta Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wynard Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Wnukowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norbert Wnukowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Yarborough
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Mon 11/16 8:43 AM
Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants 80 Kellough and Hambacker Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses Kellough et al. v. Westgate Resorts, Ltd., L.P., et al., 4:20-cv-00711-SRC, without prejudice. The Court also dismisses Hambacker et al. v. Westgate Resorts, Ltd., L.P., et al., 4:20- cv-00833-SRC, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/13/20. (JAB) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Mon 11/09 10:50 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs ; ORDERED GRANTED. ( Response to Court due by 11/13/2020.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/9/2020. (CLO) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Extension
Fri 11/06 4:37 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Mark Berlingeri, Susan Berlingeri, Kathy Bilski, Stephan Bilski, Debra Blackston, James Blackston, Rosetta Bledsoe, gregory Borge, Melinda Bowman, Terry Bowman, Cindy Brady, Verne Brady, Betsy Braga, Carlos Braga, Lena Bronson, Marion Bronson, James Brown, Sheila Brown, James Broyles, Colleen Canning, Patrick Canning, Howard Capek, Martha Capek, Dale Carden, Wanda Carden, Julia Cash, Charles Cash, Jr., Chantal Chapoteau, Aubrey Charles, Erica Charles, Newton Christman, Barry Clay, Lena Clay, Larry Cleveringa, Marilyn Cleveringa, Linda Cochran, Ralph Cochran, Florence Coleman, Alva Collier, James Collier, Mathelda Cook, Kevin Cook, Shelia Cook, Elmo Cook, Jr., Michael Cox, Pamela Cox, Rosalind Creagan, William Creagan, Anthony Crest, Barbara Crist, Mona Crum, Samuel Crum Jr, Jeffery Damron-Robinson, Patricia Damron-Robinson, Catherine Danbury, George Danbury, Linda Daniel, David Darling Jr., Donna Dash, Robert Dash, Randolph Davis, Jeanne Day, Arthur Delbene, Pauline Dewitt, Thomas Dewitt, Ahmet Dirican, John Dougherty, Sylvia Dougherty, Bonnie Downing, Robert Downing, Janiece Drassler, Erma Dukes-Ellis, Maureen Dunn, Karen Earl, Walter Earl, Michael Ector, Suzette Ector, Harmon Edmond, Shirley Edmond, Mark Farber, Teresa Farber, Lynn Farr, Rickey Farr, Johnny Fender, Kellie Fender, Marquies Fields, Josef Fila, Mary Fila, Carolyn Filger, Randall Filger, Barbara Foley, Celestine Frazier, Addie Freytag, Joseph Gagliano, Lorene Gagliano, Joel Garhartt, Rose Garhartt, Priscilla Gibson, Sherri Gibson, Timothy Gibson, Sharman Gingrich, Jan Gordon, Larry Gordon, Francis Gorman, Norma Gorman, Frances Greene, John Greene, Eugenia Gruber, Robert Gruber, Douglas Guernsey, Michelle Guernsey, James Gutillo, Patricia Gutillo, Jose Guzman, Veronica Hambacker, John Hambacker, David Hanauer, Elizabeth Hanauer, Joseph Harrah, Lori Harrah, Christopher Harris, Donna Harrison, Elizabeth Hartman, Claudette Haskins, Janet Haynes, Jerome Haynes, Wendell Hill, Carolyn Holloway, Joel Holst, Laura Holst, Gary Horton, Natividad Horton, Delmer Huffman, Patricia Huffman, Juanita Hughes, Jewel Jacobs, Larry Jacobs, Sidney Janise, John Jansen, Karen Jansen, Doris Jones, Willis Jones, Robin Jordan, Jay Kasdorf, Patricia Kasdorf, Patricia Kelly, James Kelly, Edith Keys, Kenneth Keys, Diana Kraatz, Matthew Kraatz, Robert Larson, Doreen Lee, Joseph Lee, Helena Letsch, Allison Lewandowski, Ann Lewandowski, Harry Lewis, Leverna Lewis, Angela Livingston, Vincent Livingston, Timothy Ludden, Cheryl Lynch, Christopher Lynch, Deanna Lynch, William Lynch, Jim Maguire, Betty Makovicka, Raymond Makovicka, Angela Marcoux, Nia Marsh, Thomas Marsh, Howard Marshall, Linda Marshall, Donald Martin, Maryann Mayo, Leslie McCoy, Darrell McDonald, Janet McDonald, Jose Medina, Mychel Medina, Larry Mercer, Linda Mercer, Sandra Mercer, William Mercer, Earnest Miner, Julia Morgan, Melinda Morgan, Rodger Morgan, Ruth Morin, Althea Morris, Edward Morris, Jerome Morris, Karen Morris, Joseph Morrison, Linda Morrison, Delmire Morse, Donald Morse, Donald Nelson, Rose Nelson, Felipa Nieto, Pedro Nieto, Carol Norman, Elvin Norman, Irene Obera, George Pedrick, Tamora Pennell, John Petrovic, Margaret Petrovic, Georgia Potaris, William Potaris, Grace Pratti, Joseph Pratti, Patricia Quade, Roger Quade, Ida Quarterman, Johnnie Quarterman, Rose Raney, Jackie Raper, Willard Raper, Corey Ray, Shirley Ray, Anya Rey, Catherine Rheaume, Normand Rheaume, Darlene Richardson, Eric Richardson, Gloria Richardson, Larry Richardson, Walter Richardson, Jamine Rogers, Gert Rohall, Terry Rohall, Janice Russ, William Russ, Carolyn Russell, Dan Russell, Donn Russell, Keith Sadowsky, Linda Sadowsky, Edward Sanders, Shirley Sanders, Teresita Santiago, James Sellers, Olivia Sellers, David Shaefer, Kathleen Shaefer, Anne Sheals, Marilyn Siegel, Ralph Siegel, Robert Smith, Dough Solsby, Eva Solsby, Mark Southwith, Vicky Southwith, Robert Stewart, Phillip Stocks, Wilma Stocks, Marcel Tajchman, John Thompson, Patricia Thompson, Alexander Umana, Rosa Umana, Clara Villegas, Luis Villegas, Michael Voorhees, Patricia Voorhees, Glinder Walker, Ronald Walker, Ronald Walker, Jerry Ward, Sheila Ward, Lynn Watts, Joann Weimer, Thomas Weimer, Randy Wheeler, Johnnie Wiedeman, Harold Williams, Margretta Williams, Tiffany Williams, Wynard Williams, Deborah Wnukowski, Norbert Wnukowski, David Yarborough. (Keersemaker, Mark) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Thu 09/24 1:55 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:34 Consent MOTION for Extension of: time (consented by Defendants) by Plaintiffs (Sokolik, Michael) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/24/20. (JAB) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Extension
Wed 09/23 4:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of: time (consented by Defendants) by Plaintiffs Mark Berlingeri, Susan Berlingeri, Kathy Bilski, Stephan Bilski, Debra Blackston, James Blackston, Rosetta Bledsoe, gregory Borge, Melinda Bowman, Terry Bowman, Cindy Brady, Verne Brady, Betsy Braga, Carlos Braga, Lena Bronson, Marion Bronson, James Brown, Sheila Brown, James Broyles, Colleen Canning, Patrick Canning, Howard Capek, Martha Capek, Dale Carden, Wanda Carden, Julia Cash, Charles Cash, Jr., Chantal Chapoteau, Aubrey Charles, Erica Charles, Newton Christman, Barry Clay, Lena Clay, Larry Cleveringa, Marilyn Cleveringa, Linda Cochran, Ralph Cochran, Florence Coleman, Alva Collier, James Collier, Mathelda Cook, Kevin Cook, Shelia Cook, Elmo Cook, Jr., Michael Cox, Pamela Cox, Rosalind Creagan, William Creagan, Anthony Crest, Barbara Crist, Mona Crum, Samuel Crum Jr, Jeffery Damron-Robinson, Patricia Damron-Robinson, Catherine Danbury, George Danbury, Linda Daniel, David Darling Jr., Donna Dash, Robert Dash, Randolph Davis, Jeanne Day, Arthur Delbene, Pauline Dewitt, Thomas Dewitt, Ahmet Dirican, John Dougherty, Sylvia Dougherty, Bonnie Downing, Robert Downing, Janiece Drassler, Erma Dukes-Ellis, Maureen Dunn, Karen Earl, Walter Earl, Michael Ector, Suzette Ector, Harmon Edmond, Shirley Edmond, Mark Farber, Teresa Farber, Lynn Farr, Rickey Farr, Johnny Fender, Kellie Fender, Marquies Fields, Josef Fila, Mary Fila, Carolyn Filger, Randall Filger, Barbara Foley, Celestine Frazier, Addie Freytag, Joseph Gagliano, Lorene Gagliano, Joel Garhartt, Rose Garhartt, Priscilla Gibson, Sherri Gibson, Timothy Gibson, Sharman Gingrich, Jan Gordon, Larry Gordon, Francis Gorman, Norma Gorman, Frances Greene, John Greene, Eugenia Gruber, Robert Gruber, Douglas Guernsey, Michelle Guernsey, James Gutillo, Patricia Gutillo, Jose Guzman, Veronica Hambacker, John Hambacker, David Hanauer, Elizabeth Hanauer, Joseph Harrah, Lori Harrah, Christopher Harris, Donna Harrison, Elizabeth Hartman, Claudette Haskins, Janet Haynes, Jerome Haynes, Wendell Hill, Carolyn Holloway, Joel Holst, Laura Holst, Gary Horton, Natividad Horton, Delmer Huffman, Patricia Huffman, Juanita Hughes, Jewel Jacobs, Larry Jacobs, Sidney Janise, John Jansen, Karen Jansen, Doris Jones, Willis Jones, Robin Jordan, Jay Kasdorf, Patricia Kasdorf, Patricia Kelly, James Kelly, Edith Keys, Kenneth Keys, Diana Kraatz, Matthew Kraatz, Robert Larson, Doreen Lee, Joseph Lee, Helena Letsch, Allison Lewandowski, Ann Lewandowski, Harry Lewis, Leverna Lewis, Angela Livingston, Vincent Livingston, Timothy Ludden, Cheryl Lynch, Christopher Lynch, Deanna Lynch, William Lynch, Jim Maguire, Betty Makovicka, Raymond Makovicka, Angela Marcoux, Nia Marsh, Thomas Marsh, Howard Marshall, Linda Marshall, Donald Martin, Maryann Mayo, Leslie McCoy, Darrell McDonald, Janet McDonald, Jose Medina, Mychel Medina, Larry Mercer, Linda Mercer, Sandra Mercer, William Mercer, Earnest Miner, Julia Morgan, Melinda Morgan, Rodger Morgan, Ruth Morin, Althea Morris, Edward Morris, Jerome Morris, Karen Morris, Joseph Morrison, Linda Morrison, Delmire Morse, Donald Morse, Donald Nelson, Rose Nelson, Felipa Nieto, Pedro Nieto, Carol Norman, Elvin Norman, Irene Obera, George Pedrick, Tamora Pennell, John Petrovic, Margaret Petrovic, Georgia Potaris, William Potaris, Grace Pratti, Joseph Pratti, Patricia Quade, Roger Quade, Ida Quarterman, Johnnie Quarterman, Rose Raney, Jackie Raper, Willard Raper, Corey Ray, Shirley Ray, Anya Rey, Catherine Rheaume, Normand Rheaume, Darlene Richardson, Eric Richardson, Gloria Richardson, Larry Richardson, Walter Richardson, Jamine Rogers, Gert Rohall, Terry Rohall, Janice Russ, William Russ, Carolyn Russell, Dan Russell, Donn Russell, Keith Sadowsky, Linda Sadowsky, Edward Sanders, Shirley Sanders, Teresita Santiago, James Sellers, Olivia Sellers, David Shaefer, Kathleen Shaefer, Anne Sheals, Marilyn Siegel, Ralph Siegel, Robert Smith, Dough Solsby, Eva Solsby, Mark Southwith, Vicky Southwith, Robert Stewart, Phillip Stocks, Wilma Stocks, Marcel Tajchman, John Thompson, Patricia Thompson, Alexander Umana, Rosa Umana, Clara Villegas, Luis Villegas, Michael Voorhees, Patricia Voorhees, Glinder Walker, Ronald Walker, Ronald Walker, Jerry Ward, Sheila Ward, Lynn Watts, Joann Weimer, Thomas Weimer, Randy Wheeler, Johnnie Wiedeman, Harold Williams, Margretta Williams, Tiffany Williams, Wynard Williams, Deborah Wnukowski. (Sokolik, Michael) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Dismiss (other than a party or the case)
Fri 09/11 2:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss :and Motion to Strike Hambacker Plaintiffs' "Petition" by Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (New, Eliot) |
|
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Fri 09/11 11:53 AM
ORDER: The Court ordered Hambacker, et al. v. Westgate, Ltd, L.P., et al., No. 4:20-cv-00833MTS consolidated with the above captioned matter until the close of discovery, at which point the cases will be unconsolidated for dispositive motions and trial. [Doc. 34 ]. The Court orders that all future filings in the consolidated cases, other than pleadings as defined in Rule 7(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, should be made in Case No. 4:20-cv-00711-SRC, which is designated as the Lead Case, and should only reference that case number. The Court further orders that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in the Lead Case and the above-listed member case. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/11/2020. Associated Cases: 4:20-cv-00711-SRC, 4:20-cv-00833-SRC(CLO) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Leave to
Tue 09/08 5:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to To File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Mark Berlingeri, Susan Berlingeri, Kathy Bilski, Stephan Bilski, Debra Blackston, James Blackston, Rosetta Bledsoe, gregory Borge, Melinda Bowman, Terry Bowman, Cindy Brady, Verne Brady, Betsy Braga, Carlos Braga, Lena Bronson, Marion Bronson, James Brown, Sheila Brown, James Broyles, Colleen Canning, Patrick Canning, Howard Capek, Martha Capek, Dale Carden, Wanda Carden, Julia Cash, Charles Cash, Jr., Chantal Chapoteau, Aubrey Charles, Erica Charles, Newton Christman, Barry Clay, Lena Clay, Larry Cleveringa, Marilyn Cleveringa, Linda Cochran, Ralph Cochran, Florence Coleman, Alva Collier, James Collier, Mathelda Cook, Kevin Cook, Shelia Cook, Elmo Cook, Jr., Michael Cox, Pamela Cox, Rosalind Creagan, William Creagan, Anthony Crest, Barbara Crist, Mona Crum, Samuel Crum Jr, Jeffery Damron-Robinson, Patricia Damron-Robinson, Catherine Danbury, George Danbury, Linda Daniel, David Darling Jr., Donna Dash, Robert Dash, Randolph Davis, Jeanne Day, Arthur Delbene, Pauline Dewitt, Thomas Dewitt, Ahmet Dirican, John Dougherty, Sylvia Dougherty, Bonnie Downing, Robert Downing, Janiece Drassler, Erma Dukes-Ellis, Maureen Dunn, Karen Earl, Walter Earl, Michael Ector, Suzette Ector, Harmon Edmond, Shirley Edmond, Mark Farber, Teresa Farber, Lynn Farr, Rickey Farr, Johnny Fender, Kellie Fender, Marquies Fields, Josef Fila, Mary Fila, Carolyn Filger, Randall Filger, Barbara Foley, Celestine Frazier, Addie Freytag, Joseph Gagliano, Lorene Gagliano, Joel Garhartt, Rose Garhartt, Priscilla Gibson, Sherri Gibson, Timothy Gibson, Sharman Gingrich, Jan Gordon, Larry Gordon, Francis Gorman, Norma Gorman, Frances Greene, John Greene, Eugenia Gruber, Robert Gruber, Douglas Guernsey, Michelle Guernsey, James Gutillo, Patricia Gutillo, Jose Guzman, Veronica Hambacker, John Hambacker, David Hanauer, Elizabeth Hanauer, Joseph Harrah, Lori Harrah, Christopher Harris, Donna Harrison, Elizabeth Hartman, Claudette Haskins, Janet Haynes, Jerome Haynes, Wendell Hill, Carolyn Holloway, Joel Holst, Laura Holst, Gary Horton, Natividad Horton, Delmer Huffman, Patricia Huffman, Juanita Hughes, Jewel Jacobs, Larry Jacobs, Sidney Janise, John Jansen, Karen Jansen, Doris Jones, Willis Jones, Robin Jordan, Jay Kasdorf, Patricia Kasdorf, Patricia Kelly, James Kelly, Edith Keys, Kenneth Keys, Diana Kraatz, Matthew Kraatz, Robert Larson, Doreen Lee, Joseph Lee, Helena Letsch, Allison Lewandowski, Ann Lewandowski, Harry Lewis, Leverna Lewis, Angela Livingston, Vincent Livingston, Timothy Ludden, Cheryl Lynch, Christopher Lynch, Deanna Lynch, William Lynch, Jim Maguire, Betty Makovicka, Raymond Makovicka, Angela Marcoux, Nia Marsh, Thomas Marsh, Howard Marshall, Linda Marshall, Donald Martin, Maryann Mayo, Leslie McCoy, Darrell McDonald, Janet McDonald, Jose Medina, Mychel Medina, Larry Mercer, Linda Mercer, Sandra Mercer, William Mercer, Earnest Miner, Julia Morgan, Melinda Morgan, Rodger Morgan, Ruth Morin, Althea Morris, Edward Morris, Jerome Morris, Karen Morris, Joseph Morrison, Linda Morrison, Delmire Morse, Donald Morse, Donald Nelson, Rose Nelson, Felipa Nieto, Pedro Nieto, Carol Norman, Elvin Norman, Irene Obera, George Pedrick, Tamora Pennell, John Petrovic, Margaret Petrovic, Georgia Potaris, William Potaris, Grace Pratti, Joseph Pratti, Patricia Quade, Roger Quade, Ida Quarterman, Johnnie Quarterman, Rose Raney, Jackie Raper, Willard Raper, Corey Ray, Shirley Ray, Anya Rey, Catherine Rheaume, Normand Rheaume, Darlene Richardson, Eric Richardson, Gloria Richardson, Larry Richardson, Walter Richardson, Jamine Rogers, Gert Rohall, Terry Rohall, Janice Russ, William Russ, Carolyn Russell, Dan Russell, Donn Russell, Keith Sadowsky, Linda Sadowsky, Edward Sanders, Shirley Sanders, Teresita Santiago, James Sellers, Olivia Sellers, David Shaefer, Kathleen Shaefer, Anne Sheals, Marilyn Siegel, Ralph Siegel, Robert Smith, Dough Solsby, Eva Solsby, Mark Southwith, Vicky Southwith, Robert Stewart, Phillip Stocks, Wilma Stocks, Marcel Tajchman, John Thompson, Patricia Thompson, Alexander Umana, Rosa Umana, Clara Villegas, Luis Villegas, Michael Voorhees, Patricia Voorhees, Glinder Walker, Ronald Walker, Ronald Walker, Jerry Ward, Sheila Ward, Lynn Watts, Joann Weimer, Randy Wheeler, Johnnie Wiedeman, Harold Williams, Margretta Williams, Tiffany Williams, Wynard Williams, Deborah Wnukowski, Norbert Wnukowski, David Yarborough, James Acree, Shirley Acree, Rita Baker, Barbara Bowsher, Wendell Bowsher, Cassandra Butler, Alvin Caprietta, Dana Coffman, Patricia Comer, Stanley Comer, Irving Cummings, Grace Cummings, Raymond Dage, Jeffrey Gay, Karen Gay, Jacquie Haynes, Thomas Haynes, Brian Hearn, Kathleen Hearn, Bonnie Jernigan, Cheryl Jones, Emily Kellough, Jeffrey Kellough, Donald Kolander, Clifford Koleski, Donna Koleski, Veronica Mauck, William Mauck, Katharine Meyer, Rodney Meyer, James Mitchell, Marieth Mitchell, Kenner Nadermann, Dorisona Nadermann, Charles Orr, Reba Orr, Charles Richardson, Paige Smith, Larry South, Jeanne South-Shawhan, Lemoria Taylor, Ulysee Taylor, John Thomas, Martha Thompson, Troy Thompson, Walter Washington, Mac Williams, John Wright.Associated Cases: 4:20-cv-00711-SRC, 4:20-cv-00833-SRC(Sokolik, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-First Amended Petition with Track Changes, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to First Amend Added Plaintiffs, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment First Amended Peition No Track Changes | ||
Thursday, September 03, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Thu 09/03 3:47 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Thu 09/03 3:46 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Westgate Resorts, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Thu 09/03 3:45 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P.. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Thu 09/03 3:44 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Thu 09/03 3:43 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CFI Resorts Management, Inc.. Parent companies: Central Florida Investments, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Thu 09/03 3:41 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Central Florida Investments, Inc.. Subsidiaries: CFI Construction Company, Inc. CFI Financial, Inc. Westgate Resorts, Ltd.,. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Tue 09/01 10:24 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Central Florida Investments, Inc.. Subsidiaries: CFI Construction Company, Inc., CFI Financial, Inc., Westgate Reports, LTD,. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Tue 09/01 10:23 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Westgate Resorts, Inc... (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Tue 09/01 10:22 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CFI Resorts Management, Inc.. Parent companies: Central Florida Investments,. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Tue 09/01 10:21 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P... (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Tue 09/01 10:20 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC.. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Tue 09/01 10:19 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC.. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Electronic Notice of Noncompliance re: Disclosure of Organization Interests Certificate
Mon 08/31 2:39 PM
Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/4/2020. (JAB) |
|
misc
SRC COVID-19 Remark
Mon 08/31 2:35 PM
Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark] (JAB) |
||
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 08/20 2:59 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: The Court orders Hambacker, et al. v. Westgate Resorts, Ltd., L.P., et al., No. 4:20-cv-00833 MTS consolidated with this case until the close of discovery at which point the cases will be unconsolidated for dispositive motions and trial. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings. District Judge Matthew T. Schelp no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/20/2020. (CLO) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Mon 08/17 2:35 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re15 ; ORDERED GRANTED All Defendants. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/17/2020. (TMT) Modified on 8/17/2020 (TMT) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/12 11:54 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 12 Motion in Respose to Plaintiffs' Petition ;Extension to file the following: in response to Plaintiffs' Petition ;Proposed extension date September 11, 2020 by Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (New, Eliot) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 08/12 11:41 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/12/2020. (KXS) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 08/07 11:45 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Eliot New for Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (New, Eliot) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/03 2:34 PM
NOTICE Appearance: by Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC (New, Eliot) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/31 2:21 PM
NOTICE Related Court Cases: by Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 07/31 12:55 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel Richard O'Brien for Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (O'Brien, Daniel) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Entry of Appearance
Fri 07/31 12:50 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher LaRose for Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (LaRose, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, July 30, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 07/30 9:31 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard W. Epstein and6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey A. Backman; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/30/2020. (NEP) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/29 4:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard W. Epstein. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8046719) by Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Epstein, Richard) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/29 4:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey A. Backman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8046671) by Defendants CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate GV Sales & Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Backman, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/24 9:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John Hambacker, Veronica Hambacker. All Defendants.(Sokolik, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Return of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Return of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Return of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Return of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Return of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
service
Summons Reissued (Alias/Pluries)
Wed 07/01 9:08 AM
Alias Summons Issued as to defendant CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., Westgate Resorts, LTD., L.P. The summons were emailed to Michael Sokolik. (KEK) |
||
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Tue 06/30 11:08 AM
MEMORANDUM Request for Alias Summons by Plaintiffs Veronica Hambacker, John Hambacker.(Sokolik, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Central Florida Investments Inc, | ||
Att: 2 Summons CFI Resorts Management Inc, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Westgate Resorts LTD LP, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server | ||
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate
Thu 06/25 8:21 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/5/2020. (KEK) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2020 | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 06/24 12:58 PM
Case Opening Notification: 6 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Michael L. Sokolik. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG) |
||
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
service
Notice of Process Server
Wed 06/24 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Mark Berlingeri, Susan Berlingeri, Kathy Bilski, Stephan Bilski, Debra Blackston, James Blackston, Rosetta Bledsoe, gregory Borge, Melinda Bowman, Terry Bowman, Cindy Brady, Verne Brady, Betsy Braga, Carlos Braga, Lena Bronson, Marion Bronson, James Brown, Sheila Brown, James Broyles, Colleen Canning, Patrick Canning, Howard Capek, Martha Capek, Dale Carden, Wanda Carden, Julia Cash, Charles Cash, Jr., Chantal Chapoteau, Aubrey Charles, Erica Charles, Newton Christman, Barry Clay, Lena Clay, Larry Cleveringa, Marilyn Cleveringa, Linda Cochran, Ralph Cochran, Florence Coleman, Alva Collier, James Collier, Mathelda Cook, Kevin Cook, Shelia Cook, Elmo Cook, Jr., Michael Cox, Pamela Cox, Rosalind Creagan, William Creagan, Anthony Crest, Barbara Crist, Mona Crum, Samuel Crum Jr, Jeffery Damron-Robinson, Patricia Damron-Robinson, Catherine Danbury, George Danbury, Linda Daniel, David Darling Jr., Donna Dash, Robert Dash, Randolph Davis, Jeanne Day, Arthur Delbene, Pauline Dewitt, Thomas Dewitt, Ahmet Dirican, John Dougherty, Sylvia Dougherty, Bonnie Downing, Robert Downing, Janiece Drassler, Erma Dukes-Ellis, Maureen Dunn, Karen Earl, Walter Earl, Michael Ector, Suzette Ector, Harmon Edmond, Shirley Edmond, Mark Farber, Teresa Farber, Lynn Farr, Rickey Farr, Johnny Fender, Kellie Fender, Marquies Fields, Josef Fila, Mary Fila, Carolyn Filger, Randall Filger, Barbara Foley, Celestine Frazier, Addie Freytag, Joseph Gagliano, Lorene Gagliano, Joel Garhartt, Rose Garhartt, Priscilla Gibson, Sherri Gibson, Timothy Gibson, Sharman Gingrich, Jan Gordon, Larry Gordon, Francis Gorman, Norma Gorman, Frances Greene, John Greene, Eugenia Gruber, Robert Gruber, Douglas Guernsey, Michelle Guernsey, James Gutillo, Patricia Gutillo, Jose Guzman, Veronica Hambacker, John Hambacker, David Hanauer, Elizabeth Hanauer, Joseph Harrah, Lori Harrah, Christopher Harris, Donna Harrison, Elizabeth Hartman, Claudette Haskins, Janet Haynes, Jerome Haynes, Wendell Hill, Carolyn Holloway, Joel Holst, Laura Holst, Gary Horton, Natividad Horton, Delmer Huffman, Patricia Huffman, Juanita Hughes, Jewel Jacobs, Larry Jacobs, Sidney Janise, John Jansen, Karen Jansen, Doris Jones, Willis Jones, Robin Jordan, Jay Kasdorf, Patricia Kasdorf, Patricia Kelly, James Kelly, Edith Keys, Kenneth Keys, Diana Kraatz, Matthew Kraatz, Robert Larson, Doreen Lee, Joseph Lee, Helena Letsch, Allison Lewandowski, Ann Lewandowski, Harry Lewis, Leverna Lewis, Angela Livingston, Vincent Livingston, Timothy Ludden, Cheryl Lynch, Christopher Lynch, Deanna Lynch, William Lynch, Jim Maguire, Betty Makovicka, Raymond Makovicka, Angela Marcoux, Nia Marsh, Thomas Marsh, Howard Marshall, Linda Marshall, Donald Martin, Maryann Mayo, Leslie McCoy, Darrell McDonald, Janet McDonald, Jose Medina, Mychel Medina, Larry Mercer, Linda Mercer, Sandra Mercer, William Mercer, Earnest Miner, Julia Morgan, Melinda Morgan, Rodger Morgan, Ruth Morin, Althea Morris, Edward Morris, Jerome Morris, Karen Morris, Joseph Morrison, Linda Morrison, Delmire Morse, Donald Morse, Donald Nelson, Rose Nelson, Felipa Nieto, Pedro Nieto, Carol Norman, Elvin Norman, Irene Obera, George Pedrick, Tamora Pennell, John Petrovic, Margaret Petrovic, Georgia Potaris, William Potaris, Grace Pratti, Joseph Pratti, Patricia Quade, Roger Quade, Ida Quarterman, Johnnie Quarterman, Rose Raney, Jackie Raper, Willard Raper, Corey Ray, Shirley Ray, Anya Rey, Catherine Rheaume, Normand Rheaume, Darlene Richardson, Eric Richardson, Gloria Richardson, Larry Richardson, Walter Richardson, Jamine Rogers, Gert Rohall, Terry Rohall, Janice Russ, William Russ, Carolyn Russell, Dan Russell, Donn Russell, Keith Sadowsky, Linda Sadowsky, Edward Sanders, Shirley Sanders, Teresita Santiago, James Sellers, Olivia Sellers, David Shaefer, Kathleen Shaefer, Anne Sheals, Marilyn Siegel, Ralph Siegel, Robert Smith, Dough Solsby, Eva Solsby, Mark Southwith, Vicky Southwith, Robert Stewart, Phillip Stocks, Wilma Stocks, Marcel Tajchman, John Thompson, Patricia Thompson, Alexander Umana, Rosa Umana, Clara Villegas, Luis Villegas, Michael Voorhees, Patricia Voorhees, Glinder Walker, Ronald Walker, Ronald Walker, Jerry Ward, Sheila Ward, Lynn Watts, Joann Weimer, Thomas Weimer, Randy Wheeler, Johnnie Wiedeman, Harold Williams, Margretta Williams, Tiffany Williams, Wynard Williams, Deborah Wnukowski, Norbert Wnukowski, David Yarborough Process Server: CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service (MFG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/23 6:54 PM
COMPLAINT Hambacker et al., against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7981562, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Natividad Horton, Lena Clay, Harold Williams, Randall Filger, Georgia Potaris, Christopher Harris, Robert Downing, Larry Gordon, Lena Bronson, Catherine Danbury, Kellie Fender, Carolyn Russell, Alexander Umana, Rose Nelson, Linda Daniel, Catherine Rheaume, Betty Makovicka, Carolyn Filger, Mychel Medina, Newton Christman, Larry Cleveringa, Terry Bowman, Grace Pratti, Lorene Gagliano, Erica Charles, Elvin Norman, David Hanauer, Walter Richardson, David Darling Jr., Roger Quade, Ann Lewandowski, Carlos Braga, Jan Gordon, Erma Dukes-Ellis, Suzette Ector, Jeanne Day, Ahmet Dirican, James Sellers, Carol Norman, Robin Jordan, Patricia Huffman, Norbert Wnukowski, Maureen Dunn, Linda Sadowsky, Vicky Southwith, Corey Ray, George Pedrick, Howard Marshall, Rodger Morgan, Karen Jansen, Betsy Braga, Kenneth Keys, Anthony Crest, Larry Mercer, Wanda Carden, Patricia Kasdorf, Carolyn Holloway, Francis Gorman, Juanita Hughes, Earnest Miner, Donn Russell, Leverna Lewis, Howard Capek, Joel Garhartt, Christopher Lynch, Cheryl Lynch, Rosalind Creagan, Debra Blackston, Priscilla Gibson, Ralph Cochran, Mathelda Cook, Joann Weimer, Donald Nelson, Stephan Bilski, Patrick Canning, Donald Morse, Elizabeth Hartman, William Mercer, Marilyn Siegel, Jim Maguire, Robert Smith, Olivia Sellers, Karen Earl, Randolph Davis, Janice Russ, Lori Harrah, Norma Gorman, Jose Guzman, Elizabeth Hanauer, Allison Lewandowski, Jerome Morris, Ronald Walker, Celestine Frazier, Eugenia Gruber, Mary Fila, Darrell McDonald, Michael Ector, Rose Raney, Normand Rheaume, Alva Collier, Arthur Delbene, Angela Marcoux, Cindy Brady, Shelia Cook, Samuel Crum Jr, Gert Rohall, Pamela Cox, Clara Villegas, Shirley Sanders, Althea Morris, Sylvia Dougherty, John Hambacker, John Jansen, Joseph Harrah, Edith Keys, Timothy Gibson, Gloria Richardson, Dale Carden, Claudette Haskins, Rickey Farr, Phillip Stocks, Sandra Mercer, Shirley Ray, Teresita Santiago, Jerome Haynes, James Kelly, David Yarborough, Lynn Watts, John Petrovic, Deanna Lynch, Kevin Cook, Martha Capek, Michael Cox, Keith Sadowsky, Kathy Bilski, Linda Cochran, Johnnie Quarterman, Melinda Morgan, Joseph Gagliano, Mona Crum, Glinder Walker, Anne Sheals, Jewel Jacobs, Maryann Mayo, Irene Obera, Sheila Brown, Laura Holst, Elmo Cook, Jr., Charles Cash, Jr., Randy Wheeler, William Lynch, Linda Morrison, Rose Garhartt, Colleen Canning, Michelle Guernsey, William Russ, David Shaefer, Helena Letsch, Robert Larson, Shirley Edmond, John Greene, Margretta Williams, Vincent Livingston, Pauline Dewitt, Pedro Nieto, Tamora Pennell, Luis Villegas, Willis Jones, Mark Farber, Doris Jones, Robert Dash, James Broyles, Marquies Fields, Eva Solsby, Margaret Petrovic, Nia Marsh, Marion Bronson, Veronica Hambacker, Karen Morris, Lynn Farr, Douglas Guernsey, Matthew Kraatz, Terry Rohall, Jerry Ward, John Dougherty, James Gutillo, Leslie McCoy, Joseph Morrison, Larry Richardson, Edward Morris, Eric Richardson, gregory Borge, Patricia Voorhees, Harmon Edmond, Janet Haynes, Ida Quarterman, Joel Holst, Edward Sanders, Donna Harrison, Wilma Stocks, Deborah Wnukowski, Jose Medina, Joseph Pratti, Patricia Thompson, Willard Raper, Sharman Gingrich, Donald Martin, Barry Clay, Timothy Ludden, James Blackston, Teresa Farber, Julia Cash, Jamine Rogers, Sherri Gibson, Janiece Drassler, Linda Mercer, Marcel Tajchman, Julia Morgan, Robert Gruber, Tiffany Williams, Addie Freytag, Dan Russell, Melinda Bowman, Darlene Richardson, Patricia Kelly, William Potaris, Michael Voorhees, Linda Marshall, William Creagan, Larry Jacobs, Wendell Hill, Doreen Lee, Barbara Crist, Patricia Quade, Rosa Umana, Janet McDonald, George Danbury, Thomas Dewitt, James Brown, Jeffery Damron-Robinson, Johnnie Wiedeman, Bonnie Downing, Thomas Marsh, Josef Fila, Aubrey Charles, Jay Kasdorf, Gary Horton, Robert Stewart, Chantal Chapoteau, Barbara Foley, Walter Earl, James Collier, Sidney Janise, Angela Livingston, Delmire Morse, Mark Southwith, Donna Dash, Jackie Raper, Wynard Williams, Joseph Lee, Thomas Weimer, Delmer Huffman, Harry Lewis, Patricia Damron-Robinson, Ralph Siegel, Sheila Ward, Anya Rey, Verne Brady, John Thompson, Frances Greene, Johnny Fender, Mark Berlingeri, Ruth Morin, Dough Solsby, Patricia Gutillo, Rosetta Bledsoe, Diana Kraatz, Florence Coleman, Susan Berlingeri, Marilyn Cleveringa, Raymond Makovicka, Felipa Nieto, Kathleen Shaefer.(Sokolik, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons |