Blanton et al v. Aeroframe Services L L C et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Donald E Walter |
Referred: | Kathleen Kay |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-00990 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2014 |
Re-opened: | Jul 27, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 1:13 PM CST |
Defendant
Aviation Technical Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aeroframe Services L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Wells
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Blanton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramil Ivan R. Decena
|
|
Plaintiff
Tom France
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley A Olivier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard D Holt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramil Ivan R Decena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dustin Gilley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Heath
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Peak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley A. Olivier
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael McCloud
C C R 86851 LA State Penitentiary
Angola, LA 70712 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Manson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Lafleur
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Holly Labove
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Hudnall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard D. Holt
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
105 | 105
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 06/29 6:03 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER of USCA as to102 Notice of Appeal filed by Aeroframe Services L L C and103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Philip Wells, Richard D Holt, Robert Lafleur, Dustin Gilley, Holly Labove, Michael McCloud, Sean Hudnall, Tom France, Shirley A Olivier, Ramil Ivan R Decena, Ronald Blanton, Michael Heath, Carolyn Manson, Sandra Peak, that the Court has granted Appellee Aviation Technical Services, Incorporated's unopposed motion to withdraw attorney Michael Joseph O'Brien as counsel in this case. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |