Ohanian et al v. Apple Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-05162 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 02, 2021 7:14 AM EST |
Defendant
Apple Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
T-Mobile USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regge Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tigran Ohanian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
152 | 152
1
pgs
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 05/02 12:51 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:151 Order in favor of Apple Inc. against Regge Lopez, Tigran Ohanian. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated May 2, 2022, judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/2/2022) (km) |
|
Att: 1 10 pgs Right to Appeal | ||
151 | 151
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 05/02 12:06 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter Judgment in favor of Defendants. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/2/2022) (mml) |
|
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Mon 05/02 12:52 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km) |
||
Thursday, April 28, 2022 | ||
150 | 150
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/28 2:54 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Apple Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Regge Lopez. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Solomon, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2022 | ||
149 | 149
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/27 3:38 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by April 29, 2022, the parties shall refile the stipulation of voluntary dismissal in accordance with the instructions of the Clerk of Court or file a joint letter with a status update. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/27/2022) (vfr) |