Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc. v. Astonish Results, LLC et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | John J Mcconnell, Jr |
Referred: | Patricia A Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00236 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2014 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 10:30 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Astonish Results, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Mr. Thomas Couture
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Creekridge Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Astonish Results, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mr. Thomas Couture
138 Chestnut
Douglas, MA 01516 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Creekridge Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Erbie J Powers
|
|
Plaintiff
Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Erbie J Powers
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Creekridge Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 22, 2014 | ||
order
Order
Mon 09/22 3:22 PM
TEXT ORDER entering36 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/22/14. (Barletta, Barbara) |
||
Friday, September 19, 2014 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/19 10:24 AM
STIPULATION Of Dismissal, With Prejudice by Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC. |
|
Friday, June 20, 2014 | ||
35 | 35 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Erbie J Powers, filed by Creekridge Capital, LLC. | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
34 | 34 Defendant Creekridge Capital LLC's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc. by Creekridge Capital, LLC. | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
33 | 33 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc. by Creekridge Capital, LLC, Thomas Couture, Astonish Results, LLC. | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, June 12, 2014 | ||
32 | 32 NOTICE by Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC Notice of Withdrawal (Dolan, Lynne) | |
Friday, May 30, 2014 | ||
TEXT ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Astonish Results, LLC answer due 6/20/2014; Thomas Couture answer due 6/20/2014; Creekridge Capital, LLC answer due 6/20/2014.- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/30/14. (Barletta, Barbara) | ||
Wednesday, May 28, 2014 | ||
31 | 31 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re9 Amended Document to June 20, 2014 filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 6/16/2014 (Dolan, Lynne) | |
Wednesday, May 21, 2014 | ||
30 | 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Cavanagh, III on behalf of Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC (Cavanagh, Joseph) | |
29 | 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynne Barry Dolan on behalf of Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC (Dolan, Lynne) | |
Friday, May 16, 2014 | ||
28 | 28 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 2:13-cv-00257. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. | |
27 | 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and (b)(6) is DENIED, and that the defendants alternate motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) is GRANTED. [Doc. 13]. It is therefore ORDERED that the above-styled case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/16/2014. (LMC) | |
Case transferred to District of Rhode Island. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (LMC) | ||
Wednesday, May 14, 2014 | ||
26 | 26 ORDER denying as moot 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. This contract matter is before the Court to address a motion to dismiss the plaintiffs complaint filed by the defendants on October 15, 2013. Within 21 days of that responsive pleading, the plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint to correct the deficiencies in its original complaint. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). The defendants have now filed a Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to dismiss filed by the defendants is DENIED as MOOT. [Doc. 4]. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/14/2014. (JLS) | |
Tuesday, April 15, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman on 4/15/2014. (See Order for Details). (JLS) | |
Monday, April 14, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 MOTION for Protective Order by Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC.(Forrester, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Other Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 21, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 5 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants.(Forrester, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Other Order from USDC of WD of Texas | ||
Friday, February 14, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Forrester, Michael) | |
Friday, January 17, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Compel. The motion to compel is DENIED, since discovery is premature. However, the parties will consult with one another and schedule a Rule 26(f) conference within the next 21 days, and then submit the plan to this court. Thereafter, plaintiff may resubmit its discovery requests. That discovery will proceed, notwithstanding the court may not have yet ruled upon the pending motion to dismiss or transfer. If this court grants the motion to transfer, the completed discovery obviously will follow the parties to Rhode Island. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman on 1/17/2014. (JLS) | |
Friday, January 10, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 RESPONSE to Motion re18 First MOTION to Compel Astonish Results, LLC f/k/a Astonish Results, L.P., Thomas Couture and Creekridge Capital, LLC First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response filed by Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC. (Forrester, Michael) | |
Friday, January 03, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.(Miller, Jimmie) Modified on 1/3/2014 (RLC, ). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Printed Portion of Plaintiff's Website | ||
Friday, December 27, 2013 | ||
18 | 18 First MOTION to Compel Astonish Results, LLC f/k/a Astonish Results, L.P., Thomas Couture and Creekridge Capital, LLC , First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response by Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc..(Sparks, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
17 | 17 RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Alternatively, Motion to Transfer filed by Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc..(Sparks, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, December 13, 2013 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . Responses due by 12/27/2013 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman on 12/13/2013. (RLC, ) | |
Thursday, December 12, 2013 | ||
15 | 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc.. (Sparks, Matthew) | |
Wednesday, November 27, 2013 | ||
14 | 14 11 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC.(Forrester, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Pages from Complaint AJ Amer v. Astonish, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Pages of Complaint Fischer Insurance v. Astonish, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Pages of Complaint Groninger v Astonish, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Pages of Complaint Mohler v. Astonish, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Pages of Complaint of Augustyniak v. Astonish, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Order of Rising Star v. Astonish, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Order of Westchester v. Astonish, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Order on Slaughter v. Astonish | ||
13 | 13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC. (Forrester, Michael) | |
Friday, November 08, 2013 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Jimmie C Miller and Michael L Forrester for Creekridge Capital, LLC. Attorney Andrew T Wampler terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman on 11/8/2013. (LMC) | |
Thursday, November 07, 2013 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Astonish Results, LLC, Thomas Couture, Creekridge Capital, LLC. (Miller, Jimmie) | |
Wednesday, November 06, 2013 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew W. Sparks, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman on 11/6/2013. (LMC) | |
Tuesday, November 05, 2013 | ||
9 | 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc.. 1st Amended Complaint . (Davenport, Clayton) | |
8 | 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew W. Sparks ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-2388273.) by Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc.. (Davenport, Clayton) | |
Wednesday, October 30, 2013 | ||
7 | 7 STIPULATION FILED by Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc.. (Davenport, Clayton) | |
Tuesday, October 29, 2013 | ||
6 | 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Nash & Powers Insurance Services, Inc.. (Davenport, Clayton) | |
Tuesday, October 15, 2013 | ||
5 | 5 8 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re4 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Astonish Results, LLC.(Miller, Jimmie) | |
Att: 1 Other Sevier County Bank v. Paymentech, | ||
Att: 2 Other Cummings v. H.I. Mayaguez | ||
4 | 4 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Astonish Results, LLC. (Miller, Jimmie) | |
Tuesday, October 08, 2013 | ||
3 | 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Creekridge Capital, LLC. (Wampler, Andrew) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Astonish Results, LLC. (Miller, Jimmie) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sullivan County Chancery Court, case number B0024373. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-2366029), filed by Creekridge Capital, LLC, Thomas Couture, Astonish Results, LLC.(Miller, Jimmie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/8/2013) (RET, ). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Collective Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Other Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 4 Other Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk | ||
District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Dennis H Inman added. (RLC, ) | ||
The above-styled case was removed to our court from the Sullivan County Chancery Court, Tennessee on 10/8/2013. Please note the new case no. 2:13-cv-257. (RLC, ) |