Maryland District Court
Judge:James K Bredar
Case #: 1:20-cv-02045
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2020
Terminated:Dec 02, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 06, 2021 4:44 AM EST
Defendant
Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By
Adam T Simons
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe No. 1
Defendant
John Doe No. 2
Plaintiff
Alyssa Brooke Shoun
Represented By
Timothy William Romberger
Law Offices Of Timothy W Romberger
contact info
Ruth Ann Grace Azeredo
Law Office Of Ruth Ann Azeredo LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/25/2023 11:59 PM EST
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 12/02 11:42 AM
ORDER closing case re20 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/1/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 11/25 5:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Best Buy Stores, L.P.(Simons, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
19 19 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/21 12:38 PM
ORDER re18 Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/21/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation Wed 10/21 9:01 AM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Best Buy Stores, L.P.(Simons, Adam)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 10/21 12:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Best Buy Stores, L.P. answer due 11/30/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/21 1:46 PM
MARGINAL ORDER granting16 Stipulation of extension of time to respond to complaint filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/21/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Stipulation Mon 09/21 9:11 AM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Best Buy Stores, L.P.(Simons, Adam)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 09/21 1:47 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Best Buy Stores, L.P. answer due 10/22/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 08/14 4:03 PM
Marginal ORDER Approving14 Stipulation for Extension of Time filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P. Answer deadline extended to and including September 22, 2020, as to Best Buy Stores, L.P. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/14/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation Fri 08/14 2:25 PM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Best Buy Stores, L.P.(Simons, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
13 13 misc Local Rule Mon 08/10 10:50 AM
Local Rule 103.5(a) Certification of Filing of State Court Documents(Simons, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
12 12 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 07/21 10:25 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Alyssa Brooke Shoun (Romberger, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/17 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy William Romberger on behalf of Alyssa Brooke Shoun (Romberger, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
10 10 respm Response Thu 07/16 9:23 AM
RESPONSE re9 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P..(Simons, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
9 9 order Standing Order Concerning Removal Tue 07/14 6:46 PM
Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/14/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/14 6:44 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Best Buy Stores, L.P. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 07/14 6:43 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Best Buy Stores, L.P.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/14 6:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Best Buy Stores, L.P., John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, filed by Alyssa Brooke Shoun.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Comparison Copy
5 5 cmp Complaint Tue 07/14 6:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Best Buy Stores, L.P., John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, filed by Alyssa Brooke Shoun.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Information Sheet
4 4 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/13 10:33 AM
MARGINAL ORDER Approving3 Stipulation for an extension of time to respond to the complaint filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P. to August 22, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/10/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Stipulation Fri 07/10 4:38 PM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Best Buy Stores, L.P.(Simons, Adam)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 07/10 3:16 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Best Buy Stores, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Best Buy Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Best Buy Stores, L.P., Other Affiliate BBC Property Co., Other Affiliate BBC Investment Co. for Best Buy Stores, L.P..(Simons, Adam)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 07/10 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Wicomico County, case number C-22-cv-20-000191. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8749110), filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P..(Simons, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 16 pgs Complaint,
Att: 3 Case Information Report,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Amended Complaint Comparison,
Att: 7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
utility Remark - State Court Docs Tue 07/14 6:45 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR WICOMICO COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]