Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:20-bk-33568
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2020
Terminated:Aug 06, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Oct 13, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
California Resources Corporation
27200 Tourney Rd Ste 200
Santa Clarita, CA 91355-4910
Represented By
Paul E Heath
Vinson And Elkins
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


1. CRC files Chapter 11 bankruptcy (bakersfield.com)
Submitted Thu 07/16/2020
Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
822 822 claims Response Tue 03/21 12:26 PM
Response Related [+]. (Sprewell, Trika)
Related: [-] 409 Transfer of Claim,417 Transfer of Claim,418 Transfer of Claim,513 Transfer of Claim,514 Transfer of Claim,515 Transfer of Claim,516 Transfer of Claim,523 Transfer of Claim,524 Transfer of Claim,525 Transfer of Claim,526 Transfer of Claim,529 Transfer of Claim,530 Transfer of Claim,531 Transfer of Claim,532 Transfer of Claim,542 Transfer of Claim,555 Transfer of Claim,566 Transfer of Claim,567 Transfer of Claim,598 Transfer of Claim,628 Withdrawal of Claim,631 Withdrawal of Claim,632 Withdrawal of Claim,633 Withdrawal of Claim,637 Withdrawal of Claim,639 Withdrawal of Claim,641 Withdrawal of Claim,655 Withdrawal of Claim,656 Withdrawal of Claim,659 Withdrawal of Claim,669 Withdrawal of Claim,670 Withdrawal of Claim,672 Withdrawal of Claim,686 Withdrawal of Claim,694 Withdrawal of Claim,695 Withdrawal of Claim,696 Withdrawal of Claim,697 Withdrawal of Claim,698 Withdrawal of Claim,700 Withdrawal of Claim,708 Withdrawal of Claim,713 Withdrawal of Claim,729 Withdrawal of Claim,732 Withdrawal of Claim,733 Withdrawal of Claim,739 Withdrawal of Claim,740 Withdrawal of Claim,741 Withdrawal of Claim,743 Withdrawal of Claim,744 Withdrawal of Claim,745 Withdrawal of Claim,746 Withdrawal of Claim,747 Withdrawal of Claim,748 Withdrawal of Claim,750 Withdrawal of Claim,751 Withdrawal of Claim,752 Withdrawal of Claim,753 Withdrawal of Claim,754 Withdrawal of Claim,757 Withdrawal of Claim,758 Withdrawal of Claim,762 Withdrawal of Claim,773 Withdrawal of Claim,776 Objection to Claim,814 Withdrawal of Claim,815 Withdrawal of Claim,820 Withdrawal of Claim