Madjdi v. Javaheri
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-13659
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-13659
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Julia W Brand |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-01161 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mitra Javaheri
1621 Amberwood Dr. # D
South Pasadena, CA 91030 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mahboubeh Madjdi
29 Via Abruzzi
Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Peter J Mastan (TR)
550 S Hope Street, Suite 1765
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
46 | 46
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 08/26 4:53 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1161 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Bryant, Sandra R.) |
|
Saturday, August 14, 2021 | ||
45 | 45
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 08/14 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/14/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 12, 2021 | ||
44 | 44
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Thu 08/12 3:51 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Involving Claims under Sections 523(a)and727 ( ADV IS DISM AND PTC IS VACATED) . (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/12/2021 (Kaaumoana, William) |
|
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Tue 08/10 6:34 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Defendant Mitra Javaheri . (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
Sunday, August 08, 2021 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3))
Sun 08/08 10:34 AM
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Filed by Defendant Mitra Javaheri . (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o))
Wed 07/21 1:25 PM
Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) with Proof of Service on All Creditors and Parties in Interest Filed by Defendant Mitra Javaheri . (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
40 | 40
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Wed 07/21 12:57 PM
Stipulation By Mitra Javaheri and Plaintiff Mahboubeh Majdi for Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Involving Claims Under Sections 523(a) and 727, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Mitra Javaheri (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
Saturday, June 05, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 06/05 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/05/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
order
X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF)
Thu 06/03 3:56 PM
Order Granting ExParte Motion to continue the Pretrial Conference from June 8, 2021 @ 2:00 p.m. to August 24, 2021 @ 2:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/3/2021 (Bryant, Sandra R.) |
|
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Ex parte application (motion)
Tue 06/01 10:10 AM
Ex parte application Ex Parte Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Mitra Javaheri (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
Friday, April 16, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 04/16 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/16/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 04/14 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/14/2021. (Admin.) |
|
34 | 34
order
Withdraw As Attorney (BNC-PDF)
Wed 04/14 3:15 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/14/2021. (Kaaumoana, William) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Wed 04/14 11:32 AM
Notice of lodgment OF ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi . (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
32 | 32
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Wed 04/14 7:43 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document missing adversary proceeding number. Adversary Number. The adversary number, if any, must appear immediately below the case number and chapter number (e.g., 2:05-ap-02345-AA).THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT ADVERSARY NUMBER IMMEDIATELY> (Kaaumoana, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3))
Tue 04/13 6:05 PM
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) to Withdraw as Counsel. Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi. (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
order
X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF)
Mon 04/12 3:29 PM
Order Denying Ex Parte Motion To Continue The Pretrial Conference (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/12/2021 (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) |
|
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 04/09 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/09/2021. (Admin.) |
|
28 | 28
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Fri 04/09 1:05 PM
Hearing Continued Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Bryant, Sandra R.) |
|
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Wed 04/07 6:15 PM
Pretrial Conference Scheduling Order (PTC CONT'D TO 6-8-21 @ 2:00 PM; JOINT PT STIP ORD DUE NO LATER THAN : 5-25-21) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/7/2021 . (Kaaumoana, William) |
|
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Ex parte application (motion)
Mon 04/05 4:09 PM
Ex parte application to Continue the Pretrial Conference for April 6, 2021 by 60 days, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Mitra Javaheri (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Declaration
Fri 03/26 4:22 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Fari Bari Nejadpour in Support to Status of the Case. Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi. (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o))
Thu 03/25 12:56 PM
Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) to Withdraw as Counsel. Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi. (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Withdraw As Attorney (motion)
Thu 03/25 12:54 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 02/03 9:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Mon 02/01 6:05 PM
Hearing Continued Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Bryant, Sandra R.) |
|
20 | 20
order
X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF)
Mon 02/01 4:30 PM
Order Approving Stipulatiion to Continue the PreTrial Conference (PTC CURRENTLY SCH FOR 2/9/2021 @ 2:00PM IS CONT'D TO 4/6/2021 AT 2:00PM)(BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/1/2021 (Kaaumoana, William) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Fri 01/29 10:36 AM
Notice of lodgment of Order Approving Stipulation with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Mitra Javaheri . (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Fri 01/29 10:25 AM
Stipulation By Mitra Javaheri and Plaintiff Mahboubeh Majdi to Continue Pretrial Conference and Deadlines, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Mitra Javaheri (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Reply
Thu 01/07 7:42 AM
Reply to with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Mitra Javaheri (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice
Tue 01/05 12:50 PM
Notice RE Request for Disclosure of Discovery Documents under LBR 7026-2(d) . (Bryant, Sandra R.) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Supplemental
Fri 12/18 3:53 PM
Supplemental Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi's Discovery Request with Proof of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi. (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 09/30 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Tue 09/29 10:47 AM
Hearing Set Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Bryant, Sandra R.) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Mon 09/28 12:26 PM
Status Conference and Scheduling Order Pursuant to LBR 7016-1(a)(4) (LAST DAY COMPLETE DISCOVERY: 1 15-2021 PTC CONF. DT: 2 9-2021 @ 2:00PM; LAST DAY TO CPLT MEDIATION: 1 15-2021 ) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 9/28/2020. (Kaaumoana, William) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Tue 09/22 3:26 PM
Notice of lodgment ORDER OR JUDGMENT IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING - STATUS REPORT Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi . (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status report
Tue 09/01 12:45 PM
Status report Joint Status Report. Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi . (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/19 3:55 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Mitra Javaheri. (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Wed 07/22 10:00 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) for Defendant Javaheri Filed by Gorginian, Sevan. (Gorginian, Sevan) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Tue 07/21 1:02 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other - **PLEASE INCLUDE THE UPCOMING STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING DATE.** THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (Bryant, Sandra R.) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proof of service
Tue 07/21 11:09 AM
Proof of service of Summons and Notice of Status Conference, and Notice of Compliance with LBR 7026-1 and FRBP 7026. Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi. (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice
Tue 07/21 10:07 AM
Notice of Compliance with LBR 7026-1 and FRBP 7026 Filed by Plaintiff Mahboubeh Madjdi. (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 07/20 1:43 PM
Summons Issued on Mitra Javaheri Date Issued 7/20/2020, Answer Due 8/19/2020 Status hearing to be held on 9/22/2020 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Kaaumoana, William) |
|
Att: 1 Pro-Bono (Spanish) | ||
3 | 3
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Mon 07/20 1:37 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect case data/statistical information was entered at the time of filing. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (Kaaumoana, William) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Mon 07/20 1:33 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Plaintiff/defendant/attorney/party information was not entered in the system at the time of filing. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (Kaaumoana, William) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/20 10:00 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01161. Complaint by Mahboubeh Madjdi against Mitra Javaheri. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (Nejadpour, Fari) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Summons $ Cover Sheet |