California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:20-cv-06549
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Sep 06, 2020 2:14 AM PDT
Defendant
County of Santa Barbara
Represented By
Mary Pat Barry
Santa Barbara County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Phillip Farley
Represented By
Mary Pat Barry
Santa Barbara County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
John Gruttaduario
Represented By
Mary Pat Barry
Santa Barbara County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Rogers
Represented By
Mary Pat Barry
Santa Barbara County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Desiree Thome
Represented By
Mary Pat Barry
Santa Barbara County Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaitland Ely-Sweet
Represented By
John Leonard Burris
John L Burris Law Offices
contact info
DeWitt M Lacy
John L Burris Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Ron Ely
Represented By
John Leonard Burris
John L Burris Law Offices
contact info
DeWitt M Lacy
John L Burris Law Offices
contact info

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
18 18 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 10/27 3:01 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/27/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/26 2:06 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition16 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants County of Santa Barbara, Phillip Farley(in his capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), John Gruttaduario(individually), Jeremy Rogers(in his official capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), Desiree Thome(in her official capacity as a sergeant for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department).(Barry, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
16 16 31 pgs othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 09/25 10:38 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Ron Ely(Lacy, DeWitt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/25 9:49 AM
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO PERMIT PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation14 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Ron Ely, by his Guardian Ad Litem Kirsten Ely, and Kaitland Ely-Sweet, are permitted to file a First Amended Complaint in this action and shall file their First Amended Complaint by 9/25/2020. Defendants' response to the First Amended Complaint is due 30 days from the date of filing and service of the First Amended Complaint. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
14 14 stip Amend/Correct Fri 09/18 11:23 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants County of Santa Barbara, Phillip Farley(individualy), John Gruttaduario(in his official capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), Jeremy Rogers(individually), Desiree Thome(individually ).(Barry, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mary Pat Barry,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
13 13 1 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 08/11 4:58 PM
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SANTA BARBARA TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation11 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant County of Santa Barbara's time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 10/2/2020. (gk)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 08/11 12:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants County of Santa Barbara, Phillip Farley(in his capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), John Gruttaduario(in his official capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), Jeremy Rogers(in his official capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), Desiree Thome(in her official capacity as a sergeant for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), (Barry, Mary)
Related: [-]
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 08/11 12:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 2, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants County of Santa Barbara, Phillip Farley(in his capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), John Gruttaduario(in his official capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), Jeremy Rogers(in his official capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), Desiree Thome(in her official capacity as a sergeant for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department).(Attorney Mary Pat Barry added to party County of Santa Barbara(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Pat Barry added to party Phillip Farley(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Pat Barry added to party John Gruttaduario(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Pat Barry added to party Jeremy Rogers(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Pat Barry added to party Desiree Thome(pty:dft))(Barry, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration of Mary Pat Barry,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 06, 2020
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 08/06 10:30 AM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Kaitland Ely-Sweet, Ron Ely, upon Defendant County of Santa Barbara served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lacy, DeWitt)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 07/24 5:06 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/23 1:01 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants County of Santa Barbara, Phillip Farley(individualy), Phillip Farley(in his capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), John Gruttaduario(in his official capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), John Gruttaduario(individually), Jeremy Rogers(individually), Jeremy Rogers(in his official capacity as a deputy for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department), Desiree Thome(individually ), Desiree Thome(in her official capacity as a sergeant for the Santa Barbara County Sheriffs Department). (lh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons as to Defendant Desiree Thome,
Att: 2 Summons as to Defendant Jeremy Rogers,
Att: 3 Summons as to defendant John Gruttaduario,
Att: 4 Summons as to Defendant Phillip Farley
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 07/23 12:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 07/23 12:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Thu 07/23 11:50 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiffs Kaitland Ely, Ron Ely.(Lacy, DeWitt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summons Thome,
Att: 2 Supplement Summons Rogers,
Att: 3 Supplement Summons Gruttaduario,
Att: 4 Supplement Summons Farley
4 4 notice Subpoena Request (AO 88) Thu 07/23 11:43 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiffs Kaitland Ely, Ron Ely. (Lacy, DeWitt)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 07/23 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Kaitland Ely, Ron Ely, (Lacy, DeWitt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 07/23 11:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kaitland Ely, Ron Ely. (Lacy, DeWitt)
Related: [-]
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/23 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27330705 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Ron Ely, Kaitland Ely. (Attorney DeWitt M Lacy added to party Kaitland Ely(pty:pla), Attorney DeWitt M Lacy added to party Ron Ely(pty:pla))(Lacy, DeWitt)
Related: [-]