Rexel Inc v. Twin City Electric L L C et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Foote |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-01006 |
Nature of Suit | 130 Contract - Miller Act |
Cause | 40:270 Miller Act |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2014 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 7:12 AM CST |
Defendant
Jamco Ventures L L C
|
|
Defendant
Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America
|
|
Defendant
Twin City Electric L L C
|
|
Plaintiff
Rexel Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 20, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rexel Inc. (aty,White, Francis) Modified on 8/20/2014 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C). | |
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Francis R White, III on behalf of Rexel Inc regarding document filed in ERROR as5 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss. Action taken: Modified docket entry to correctly identify as5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. (crt,Dauterive, C) | ||
Monday, June 30, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rexel Inc. Twin City Electric L L C served on 6/2/2014, answer due 6/23/2014. (aty,White, Francis) | |
Thursday, May 29, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Jamco Ventures, LLC/Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America on May 23, 2014, filed by Rexel Inc. (aty,White, Francis) | |
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rexel Inc. Jamco Ventures L L C served on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014; Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America served on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture correct filing event which sets appropriate answer due dates. See pdf document filed as3 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Dauterive, C) | ||
Tuesday, May 20, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jamco Ventures L L C, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America and Twin City Electric L L C (crt,Dauterive, C) | |
Monday, May 19, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Jamco Ventures L L C, Travelers Casualty & Surety Co of America and Twin City Electric L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2523094) filed by Rexel, Inc..(Attorney Francis R White, III added to party Rexel, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,White, Francis) Modified on 5/20/2014 to edit text (Dauterive, C). | |
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement | ||
DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 2:14-cv-1006 from Lake Charles Division to Shreveport Division. New Case Number 5:14-cv-1006 (Opened, by counsel, in wrong division). (crt,Dauterive, C) | ||
CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Dauterive, C) | ||
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rexel Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf, Attachment #2 to1 Complaint. (crt,Dauterive, C) |