Bobby J Hamby
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Theodor Albert |
Case #: | 8:11-bk-12676 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2011 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 27, 2015 |
Converted: | Mar 11, 2015 |
Dismissed: | May 28, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2015 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Jun 22, 2015 |
Debtor
Bobby J Hamby
5525 Vista del Mar
Yorba Linda, CA 92887-3283 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Jeffrey I Golden (TR)
Weiland Golden LLP P.O. Box 2470
Costa Mesa, CA 92628 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/25/2015 12:40 PM PDT |
Sunday, February 27, 2011 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:11-bk-12676) [misc,volp11] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19034192. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1039 Filed by Bobby J Hamby Schedule A due 03/14/2011. Schedule B due 03/14/2011. Schedule C due 03/14/2011. Schedule D due 03/14/2011. Schedule E due 03/14/2011. Schedule F due 03/14/2011. Schedule G due 03/14/2011. Schedule H due 03/14/2011. Schedule I due 03/14/2011. Schedule J due 03/14/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/14/2011. Statement - Form 22B Due: 03/14/2011.Statement of Related Case due 03/14/2011. Notice of available chapters due 03/14/2011. Verification of creditor matrix due 03/14/2011. Summary of schedules due 03/14/2011. Declaration concerning debtors schedules due 03/14/2011. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor due 03/14/2011. Statistical Summary due 03/14/2011. Debtor Certification of Employment Income due by 03/14/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 03/14/2011. Section 4/14/2011. (Zhou, James) | |
2 | 2 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Bobby J Hamby. (Zhou, James) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Bobby J Hamby. (Zhou, James) | |
4 | 4 Statement of Social Security Number(s) Form B21 Filed by Debtor Bobby J Hamby. (Zhou, James) |