Phinisee v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy D Degiusti |
Case #: | 5:20-cv-00767 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 04, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 31, 2021 2:28 AM CST |
Defendant
Transunion LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Phinisee
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Enhanced Recovery Company LLC
Terminated: 12/02/2020
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
Terminated: 12/17/2020
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 13, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/13 5:02 PM
ORDER re27 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Tina Phinisee. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/13/2021. (mb) |
|
Tuesday, May 11, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 05/11 3:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tina Phinisee. (Hill, Tiffany) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/18 11:06 AM
ORDER regarding25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Tina Phinisee. Plaintiff's action against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is DISMISSED with prejudice to refiling. The action remains pending against only Defendant TransUnion LLC. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/18/2021. (kmt) |
|
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 03/17 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Hill, Tiffany) |
|
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/02 11:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 7/6/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 7/20/2021; Pla witness list due 7/20/2021; Pla exhibit list due 7/20/2021; Stipulations due 10/8/221; Motions in limine due 10/8/2021; Jury instructions due 10/8/2021; Voir dire requests due 10/8/2021; Discovery due by 9/7/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 8/6/2021. Pretrial Report due by 10/8/2021.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/2/2021. (mb) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Joint Status Report
Thu 02/25 8:18 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Tina Phinisee. (Hill, Tiffany) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 02/22 2:24 PM
ORDER: Unless the Court directs otherwise, the case Scheduling Order will be issued based on the parties Joint Status Report. Should the Court decide that a scheduling conference is necessary, the conference will be conducted telephonically, pursuant to the Courts Chambers Rules located on the Courts website. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/22/2021. (mb) |
|
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 02/22 2:20 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Juston R Givens terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/22/2021. (mb) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 02/19 8:29 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Transunion LLC. (Givens, Juston) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Docket
Tue 02/02 7:33 AM
DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2021 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 2/25/2021. (mb) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 12/18 4:00 PM
ORDER re14 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/18/2020. (mb) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 12/17 8:25 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by All Plaintiffs (Hill, Tiffany) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 12/02 5:46 PM
ORDER granting15 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Only as to Enhanced Recovery Company LLC. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/2/2020. (mb) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss
Wed 12/02 12:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Enhanced Recovery Company by All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Tiffany) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 12/01 5:00 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/17/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/1/2020. (mb) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Entry of Appearance
Thu 09/17 3:22 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Creekmore, III on behalf of Enhanced Recovery Company LLC (Creekmore, Thomas) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Disclosure Statement - LLC
Thu 09/17 2:20 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Enhanced Recovery Company LLC . (Wagner, Katie) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer
Thu 09/17 2:19 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Enhanced Recovery Company LLC.(Wagner, Katie) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Entry of Appearance
Thu 09/17 2:17 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Katie N Wagner on behalf of Enhanced Recovery Company LLC (Wagner, Katie) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Entry of Appearance
Wed 09/02 10:33 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Hilary H Clifton on behalf of Transunion LLC (Clifton, Hilary) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/01 4:32 PM
ORDER re7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer. Enhanced Recovery Company LLC answer due 9/17/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/1/20. (kmt) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/01 7:53 AM
STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Tiffany) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure Statement - LLC
Mon 08/31 3:04 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Transunion LLC . (Givens, Juston) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer
Mon 08/31 3:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Transunion LLC.(Givens, Juston) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 08/31 3:01 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Juston R Givens on behalf of Transunion LLC (Givens, Juston) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/31 9:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Phinisee. All Defendants.(Hill, Tiffany) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Experian Delivery Confirmation, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Experian Return Receipt, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit TransUnion Delivery Confirmation, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit TransUnion Return Receipt, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Enhanced Recovery Delivery Confirmation, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Enhanced Recovery Return Receipt | ||
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Thu 08/06 9:53 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3214394. (Hill, Tiffany) |
||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/05 4:33 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Transunion LLC. (kmt) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/05 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Transunion LLC filed by Tina Phinisee.(kmt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |