Yager v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01548 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 16, 2014 6:04 AM EST |
Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sabrina Marie Yager
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc.
Terminated: 07/28/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Costs Taxed
Thu 02/25 2:36 PM
Costs Taxed in amount of $ 5,150.50 against plaintiff. (jlm) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Bill of Costs
Tue 02/02 2:21 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 01/26 5:01 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant against plaintiff for costs of action. (jlm) |
|
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 01/26 4:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING defendant's35 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply; GRANTING defendant's24 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING Plaintiff's27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 1/16/16. (jlm) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 01/26 5:02 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jlm) |
||
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Leave of Absence
Thu 10/15 5:17 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 11/12/15-11/19/15, 12/3/15-12/7/15, 12/21/15-1/4/16, by Edtora T. Jones. (Jones, Edtora) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 09/08 11:45 AM
Submission of35 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply , submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (jlm) |
||
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 07/31 11:36 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Supplementation of Certified OSHA Records by Sabrina Marie Yager re36 Response in Opposition to Motion,34 Reply to Response to Motion(Stewart, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit C | ||
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/27 10:14 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re35 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Sabrina Marie Yager.(Stewart, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - OSHA Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proposed Brief | ||
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 07/16 4:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply with Brief In Support by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply Brief | ||
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 07/14 12:10 PM
Submission of24 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,27 MOTION for Summary Judgment , submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (jlm) |
||
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 07/06 11:10 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sabrina Marie Yager.(Stewart, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Response (Non-Motion)
Mon 06/22 3:41 PM
RESPONSE re31 Statement of Material Facts filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 06/22 3:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Statement of Material Facts
Fri 06/19 9:38 PM
Statement of Material Facts re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Material Facts to Which No Genuine Issue Remains to be Tried filed by Sabrina Marie Yager. (Stewart, Larry) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 06/19 9:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sabrina Marie Yager.(Stewart, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Tue 06/16 2:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING23 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 6/16/15. (jlm) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/02 12:27 PM
NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation of Re-Filing Affidavit of Carl Plasket with Corrected Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment(Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Corrected Plasket Affidavit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Corrected Plasket Affidavit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Corrected Plasket Affidavit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Corrected Plasket Affidavit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Corrected Plasket Affidavit Exhibit E | ||
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 06/01 6:38 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Sabrina Marie Yager.(Stewart, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Plaintiff's Theory of Recovery in Support of Her Motion for Summary Judgment, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit F | ||
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 05/29 4:51 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Material Facts to Which No Genuine Issue Remains to be Tried by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 05/29 4:19 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Carl Plasket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Plasket Affidavit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Plasket Affidavit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Plasket Affidavit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Plasket Affidavit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Plasket Affidavit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Affidavit of Eric Robison (exhibits included), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Carl Plasket Deposition Transcript, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Plasket Deposition Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Terry Thomas Deposition Transcript, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Thomas Deposition Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Arianna Aron Deposition Transcript, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Aron Deposition Exhibit 27, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Aron Deposition Exhibit 28, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Williams Geddings, Jr. Deposition Transcript | ||
24 | 24
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 05/29 3:27 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
motion
File Excess Pages
Thu 05/28 5:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgement Brief by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Withdrawal of Motion
Wed 05/27 12:29 PM
Withdrawal of Motion21 MOTION for Extension of Time File Any Summary Judgment Motions filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Root, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 05/26 3:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time File Any Summary Judgment Motions by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Shaw, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 15, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/15 11:22 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sabrina Marie Yager.(Jones, Edtora) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 04/08 3:14 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/25/15 - 5/29/15, 9/1/15 - 9/4/15, by David Frank Root. (Root, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 03/04 5:11 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery ends on 4/30/2015. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 3/4/15. (jlm) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 03/02 12:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Sabrina Marie Yager.(Jones, Edtora) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Mon 03/02 3:13 PM
Submission of14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (jlm) |
||
Friday, February 27, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 02/27 5:34 PM
RESPONSE re14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Root, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Wednesday, February 25, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 02/25 12:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sabrina Marie Yager.(Jones, Edtora) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 02/25 11:42 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Sabrina Marie Yager.(Jones, Edtora) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, February 11, 2015 | ||
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Wed 02/11 2:48 PM
Clerks Notation re5 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) |
||
Tuesday, February 10, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice
Wed 02/11 8:12 AM
Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 2/10/15. (rsh) |
|
Friday, January 30, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/30 3:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: approving6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 1/30/15. (rsh) |
|
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 12/17 1:52 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 2/28/2015. Corresponding deadlines likewise extended. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 12/17/14. (rsh) |
|
Wednesday, December 10, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 12/10 10:07 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery First Request by Sabrina Marie Yager. (Jones, Edtora) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 12/10 3:06 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. Judge Willis B. Hunt, Jr no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:14-cv-1548-TCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jtj) |
||
Tuesday, November 11, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 11/24/14-11/28/14, 12/22/14-1/2/15, by Edtora T. Jones. (Jones, Edtora) | |
Monday, August 18, 2014 | ||
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case administratively reassigned to Judge Willis B. Hunt, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Julie E. Carnes no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:14-cv-1548-WBH. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ddm) | ||
Thursday, August 14, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 Initial Disclosures by Sabrina Marie Yager.(Jones, Edtora) | |
Monday, July 28, 2014 | ||
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING7 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc. pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (ddm) | ||
Friday, July 25, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc. by Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Shaw, Cheryl) | |
6 | 6 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Shaw, Cheryl) | |
Thursday, July 17, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Shaw, Cheryl) | |
Wednesday, July 16, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Initial Disclosures by Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Shaw, Cheryl) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Witness List, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Expert Witness List, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Document List, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Insurance Policy | ||
Monday, July 14, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation. Discovery ends on 12/11/2014.(Shaw, Cheryl) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. | |
Wednesday, May 21, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT and WAIVER OF SERVICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc. Lockheed Martin Corporation waiver mailed on 5/15/2014, answer due 7/14/2014; Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc. waiver mailed on 5/15/2014, answer due 7/14/2014. (dfb) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation, Lockheed Martin Aircraft Center, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-5197959). (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. | |
Att: 1 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint for Trial by Jury, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C - Acknowledgement and Waiver of Service of Process, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |